1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 42

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 42

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 12, 2020.

Questions

1) 864 x 397=
2) 487 x 714=
3) 264 x 348=
4) 674 x 313=
5) 963 x 527=
6) 227 x 198=
7) 601 x 476=
8) 652 x 293=
9) 972 x 125=
10) 694 x 553=
11) 594 x 906=
12) 274 x 328=
13) 753 x 172=
14) 359 x 686=
15) 351 x 369=
16) 740 x 614=
17) 853 x 747=
18) 576 x 380=
19) 697 x 528=
20) 332 x 553=
21) 306 x 710=
22) 900 x 336=
23) 549 x 255=
24) 799 x 776=
25) 978 x 410=
26) 817 x 964=
27) 655 x 914=
28) 462 x 119=
29) 829 x 412=
30) 753 x 709=
31) 864 x 644=
32) 888 x 512=
33) 474 x 105=
34) 832 x 648=
35) 938 x 281=
36) 233 x 231=
37) 921 x 941=
38) 238 x 967=
39) 424 x 505=
40) 242 x 947=
41) 825 x 329=
42) 326 x 736=
43) 256 x 458=
44) 838 x 141=
45) 662 x 900=
46) 850 x 909=
47) 635 x 150=
48) 458 x 623=
49) 906 x 907=
50) 499 x 347=




Answers

1) 864 * 397 = 343008 2) 487 * 714 = 347718 3) 264 * 348 = 91872 4) 674 * 313 = 210962 5) 963 * 527 = 507501 6) 227 * 198 = 44946 7) 601 * 476 = 286076 8) 652 * 293 = 191036 9) 972 * 125 = 121500 10) 694 * 553 = 383782 11) 594 * 906 = 538164 12) 274 * 328 = 89872 13) 753 * 172 = 129516 14) 359 * 686 = 246274 15) 351 * 369 = 129519 16) 740 * 614 = 454360 17) 853 * 747 = 637191 18) 576 * 380 = 218880 19) 697 * 528 = 368016 20) 332 * 553 = 183596 21) 306 * 710 = 217260 22) 900 * 336 = 302400 23) 549 * 255 = 139995 24) 799 * 776 = 620024 25) 978 * 410 = 400980 26) 817 * 964 = 787588 27) 655 * 914 = 598670 28) 462 * 119 = 54978 29) 829 * 412 = 341548 30) 753 * 709 = 533877 31) 864 * 644 = 556416 32) 888 * 512 = 454656 33) 474 * 105 = 49770 34) 832 * 648 = 539136 35) 938 * 281 = 263578 36) 233 * 231 = 53823 37) 921 * 941 = 866661 38) 238 * 967 = 230146 39) 424 * 505 = 214120 40) 242 * 947 = 229174 41) 825 * 329 = 271425 42) 326 * 736 = 239936 43) 256 * 458 = 117248 44) 838 * 141 = 118158 45) 662 * 900 = 595800 46) 850 * 909 = 772650 47) 635 * 150 = 95250 48) 458 * 623 = 285334 49) 906 * 907 = 821742 50) 499 * 347 = 173153

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 42

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 42