1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 43

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 43

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 13, 2020.

Questions

1) 770 x 696=
2) 722 x 691=
3) 985 x 175=
4) 488 x 955=
5) 771 x 394=
6) 279 x 569=
7) 308 x 624=
8) 301 x 454=
9) 814 x 315=
10) 493 x 269=
11) 326 x 552=
12) 929 x 900=
13) 321 x 945=
14) 157 x 125=
15) 754 x 390=
16) 844 x 102=
17) 476 x 851=
18) 810 x 474=
19) 184 x 565=
20) 894 x 196=
21) 863 x 935=
22) 164 x 911=
23) 621 x 817=
24) 495 x 684=
25) 369 x 987=
26) 369 x 552=
27) 295 x 317=
28) 364 x 922=
29) 984 x 490=
30) 180 x 412=
31) 231 x 192=
32) 662 x 361=
33) 372 x 353=
34) 786 x 338=
35) 369 x 770=
36) 116 x 837=
37) 508 x 630=
38) 635 x 816=
39) 363 x 244=
40) 486 x 239=
41) 199 x 149=
42) 316 x 660=
43) 750 x 224=
44) 494 x 726=
45) 378 x 962=
46) 254 x 792=
47) 850 x 200=
48) 123 x 378=
49) 393 x 203=
50) 481 x 760=




Answers

1) 770 * 696 = 535920 2) 722 * 691 = 498902 3) 985 * 175 = 172375 4) 488 * 955 = 466040 5) 771 * 394 = 303774 6) 279 * 569 = 158751 7) 308 * 624 = 192192 8) 301 * 454 = 136654 9) 814 * 315 = 256410 10) 493 * 269 = 132617 11) 326 * 552 = 179952 12) 929 * 900 = 836100 13) 321 * 945 = 303345 14) 157 * 125 = 19625 15) 754 * 390 = 294060 16) 844 * 102 = 86088 17) 476 * 851 = 405076 18) 810 * 474 = 383940 19) 184 * 565 = 103960 20) 894 * 196 = 175224 21) 863 * 935 = 806905 22) 164 * 911 = 149404 23) 621 * 817 = 507357 24) 495 * 684 = 338580 25) 369 * 987 = 364203 26) 369 * 552 = 203688 27) 295 * 317 = 93515 28) 364 * 922 = 335608 29) 984 * 490 = 482160 30) 180 * 412 = 74160 31) 231 * 192 = 44352 32) 662 * 361 = 238982 33) 372 * 353 = 131316 34) 786 * 338 = 265668 35) 369 * 770 = 284130 36) 116 * 837 = 97092 37) 508 * 630 = 320040 38) 635 * 816 = 518160 39) 363 * 244 = 88572 40) 486 * 239 = 116154 41) 199 * 149 = 29651 42) 316 * 660 = 208560 43) 750 * 224 = 168000 44) 494 * 726 = 358644 45) 378 * 962 = 363636 46) 254 * 792 = 201168 47) 850 * 200 = 170000 48) 123 * 378 = 46494 49) 393 * 203 = 79779 50) 481 * 760 = 365560

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 43

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 43