1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 44

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 44

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 14, 2020.

Questions

1) 363 x 860=
2) 560 x 880=
3) 313 x 885=
4) 839 x 210=
5) 338 x 203=
6) 556 x 371=
7) 361 x 482=
8) 100 x 744=
9) 162 x 326=
10) 381 x 531=
11) 277 x 674=
12) 779 x 590=
13) 406 x 783=
14) 606 x 932=
15) 888 x 852=
16) 367 x 771=
17) 171 x 804=
18) 946 x 629=
19) 396 x 751=
20) 649 x 627=
21) 588 x 132=
22) 647 x 493=
23) 701 x 972=
24) 893 x 709=
25) 445 x 346=
26) 117 x 465=
27) 529 x 808=
28) 583 x 366=
29) 631 x 752=
30) 471 x 257=
31) 426 x 676=
32) 461 x 320=
33) 470 x 539=
34) 834 x 664=
35) 476 x 215=
36) 963 x 161=
37) 976 x 760=
38) 937 x 865=
39) 839 x 217=
40) 138 x 644=
41) 891 x 720=
42) 443 x 516=
43) 378 x 896=
44) 235 x 985=
45) 428 x 305=
46) 980 x 682=
47) 441 x 227=
48) 508 x 783=
49) 734 x 550=
50) 139 x 112=




Answers

1) 363 * 860 = 312180 2) 560 * 880 = 492800 3) 313 * 885 = 277005 4) 839 * 210 = 176190 5) 338 * 203 = 68614 6) 556 * 371 = 206276 7) 361 * 482 = 174002 8) 100 * 744 = 74400 9) 162 * 326 = 52812 10) 381 * 531 = 202311 11) 277 * 674 = 186698 12) 779 * 590 = 459610 13) 406 * 783 = 317898 14) 606 * 932 = 564792 15) 888 * 852 = 756576 16) 367 * 771 = 282957 17) 171 * 804 = 137484 18) 946 * 629 = 595034 19) 396 * 751 = 297396 20) 649 * 627 = 406923 21) 588 * 132 = 77616 22) 647 * 493 = 318971 23) 701 * 972 = 681372 24) 893 * 709 = 633137 25) 445 * 346 = 153970 26) 117 * 465 = 54405 27) 529 * 808 = 427432 28) 583 * 366 = 213378 29) 631 * 752 = 474512 30) 471 * 257 = 121047 31) 426 * 676 = 287976 32) 461 * 320 = 147520 33) 470 * 539 = 253330 34) 834 * 664 = 553776 35) 476 * 215 = 102340 36) 963 * 161 = 155043 37) 976 * 760 = 741760 38) 937 * 865 = 810505 39) 839 * 217 = 182063 40) 138 * 644 = 88872 41) 891 * 720 = 641520 42) 443 * 516 = 228588 43) 378 * 896 = 338688 44) 235 * 985 = 231475 45) 428 * 305 = 130540 46) 980 * 682 = 668360 47) 441 * 227 = 100107 48) 508 * 783 = 397764 49) 734 * 550 = 403700 50) 139 * 112 = 15568

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 44

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 44