1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 45

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 45

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 15, 2020.

Questions

1) 494 x 209=
2) 911 x 810=
3) 817 x 719=
4) 471 x 693=
5) 744 x 241=
6) 395 x 637=
7) 461 x 891=
8) 996 x 555=
9) 489 x 178=
10) 355 x 449=
11) 200 x 966=
12) 627 x 139=
13) 442 x 720=
14) 920 x 449=
15) 137 x 765=
16) 859 x 862=
17) 277 x 671=
18) 887 x 397=
19) 254 x 780=
20) 988 x 222=
21) 104 x 769=
22) 317 x 462=
23) 492 x 907=
24) 613 x 519=
25) 554 x 117=
26) 967 x 972=
27) 853 x 972=
28) 443 x 209=
29) 868 x 552=
30) 155 x 603=
31) 394 x 202=
32) 798 x 700=
33) 226 x 355=
34) 871 x 343=
35) 858 x 496=
36) 548 x 632=
37) 518 x 197=
38) 537 x 240=
39) 579 x 448=
40) 108 x 855=
41) 677 x 679=
42) 473 x 546=
43) 445 x 491=
44) 606 x 984=
45) 248 x 158=
46) 99 x 264=
47) 599 x 793=
48) 462 x 621=
49) 783 x 705=
50) 725 x 304=




Answers

1) 494 * 209 = 103246 2) 911 * 810 = 737910 3) 817 * 719 = 587423 4) 471 * 693 = 326403 5) 744 * 241 = 179304 6) 395 * 637 = 251615 7) 461 * 891 = 410751 8) 996 * 555 = 552780 9) 489 * 178 = 87042 10) 355 * 449 = 159395 11) 200 * 966 = 193200 12) 627 * 139 = 87153 13) 442 * 720 = 318240 14) 920 * 449 = 413080 15) 137 * 765 = 104805 16) 859 * 862 = 740458 17) 277 * 671 = 185867 18) 887 * 397 = 352139 19) 254 * 780 = 198120 20) 988 * 222 = 219336 21) 104 * 769 = 79976 22) 317 * 462 = 146454 23) 492 * 907 = 446244 24) 613 * 519 = 318147 25) 554 * 117 = 64818 26) 967 * 972 = 939924 27) 853 * 972 = 829116 28) 443 * 209 = 92587 29) 868 * 552 = 479136 30) 155 * 603 = 93465 31) 394 * 202 = 79588 32) 798 * 700 = 558600 33) 226 * 355 = 80230 34) 871 * 343 = 298753 35) 858 * 496 = 425568 36) 548 * 632 = 346336 37) 518 * 197 = 102046 38) 537 * 240 = 128880 39) 579 * 448 = 259392 40) 108 * 855 = 92340 41) 677 * 679 = 459683 42) 473 * 546 = 258258 43) 445 * 491 = 218495 44) 606 * 984 = 596304 45) 248 * 158 = 39184 46) 99 * 264 = 26136 47) 599 * 793 = 475007 48) 462 * 621 = 286902 49) 783 * 705 = 552015 50) 725 * 304 = 220400

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 45

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 45