1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 46

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 46

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 16, 2020.

Questions

1) 532 x 754=
2) 366 x 782=
3) 164 x 304=
4) 751 x 751=
5) 126 x 552=
6) 699 x 401=
7) 746 x 324=
8) 765 x 670=
9) 256 x 910=
10) 109 x 943=
11) 846 x 175=
12) 987 x 189=
13) 533 x 188=
14) 575 x 153=
15) 731 x 999=
16) 947 x 916=
17) 967 x 751=
18) 301 x 254=
19) 182 x 861=
20) 282 x 634=
21) 119 x 461=
22) 171 x 891=
23) 815 x 764=
24) 511 x 236=
25) 676 x 155=
26) 830 x 550=
27) 199 x 949=
28) 682 x 719=
29) 306 x 954=
30) 706 x 915=
31) 460 x 601=
32) 983 x 711=
33) 750 x 470=
34) 842 x 250=
35) 162 x 585=
36) 677 x 557=
37) 317 x 482=
38) 675 x 691=
39) 594 x 533=
40) 747 x 154=
41) 679 x 355=
42) 141 x 532=
43) 416 x 956=
44) 333 x 234=
45) 887 x 879=
46) 300 x 376=
47) 643 x 997=
48) 591 x 345=
49) 840 x 145=
50) 971 x 585=




Answers

1) 532 * 754 = 401128 2) 366 * 782 = 286212 3) 164 * 304 = 49856 4) 751 * 751 = 564001 5) 126 * 552 = 69552 6) 699 * 401 = 280299 7) 746 * 324 = 241704 8) 765 * 670 = 512550 9) 256 * 910 = 232960 10) 109 * 943 = 102787 11) 846 * 175 = 148050 12) 987 * 189 = 186543 13) 533 * 188 = 100204 14) 575 * 153 = 87975 15) 731 * 999 = 730269 16) 947 * 916 = 867452 17) 967 * 751 = 726217 18) 301 * 254 = 76454 19) 182 * 861 = 156702 20) 282 * 634 = 178788 21) 119 * 461 = 54859 22) 171 * 891 = 152361 23) 815 * 764 = 622660 24) 511 * 236 = 120596 25) 676 * 155 = 104780 26) 830 * 550 = 456500 27) 199 * 949 = 188851 28) 682 * 719 = 490358 29) 306 * 954 = 291924 30) 706 * 915 = 645990 31) 460 * 601 = 276460 32) 983 * 711 = 698913 33) 750 * 470 = 352500 34) 842 * 250 = 210500 35) 162 * 585 = 94770 36) 677 * 557 = 377089 37) 317 * 482 = 152794 38) 675 * 691 = 466425 39) 594 * 533 = 316602 40) 747 * 154 = 115038 41) 679 * 355 = 241045 42) 141 * 532 = 75012 43) 416 * 956 = 397696 44) 333 * 234 = 77922 45) 887 * 879 = 779673 46) 300 * 376 = 112800 47) 643 * 997 = 641071 48) 591 * 345 = 203895 49) 840 * 145 = 121800 50) 971 * 585 = 568035

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 46

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 46