1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 47

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 47

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on October 17, 2020.

Questions

1) 210 x 311=
2) 469 x 908=
3) 392 x 616=
4) 864 x 150=
5) 750 x 933=
6) 355 x 635=
7) 757 x 956=
8) 413 x 449=
9) 604 x 397=
10) 710 x 226=
11) 568 x 443=
12) 775 x 981=
13) 695 x 629=
14) 873 x 533=
15) 599 x 750=
16) 353 x 216=
17) 560 x 393=
18) 268 x 163=
19) 710 x 717=
20) 620 x 916=
21) 635 x 822=
22) 727 x 157=
23) 428 x 125=
24) 174 x 782=
25) 538 x 676=
26) 261 x 436=
27) 709 x 174=
28) 436 x 745=
29) 776 x 640=
30) 780 x 275=
31) 474 x 842=
32) 711 x 393=
33) 532 x 995=
34) 978 x 661=
35) 783 x 287=
36) 546 x 711=
37) 697 x 460=
38) 248 x 982=
39) 701 x 400=
40) 868 x 537=
41) 565 x 707=
42) 207 x 327=
43) 748 x 329=
44) 790 x 174=
45) 207 x 344=
46) 831 x 109=
47) 148 x 891=
48) 804 x 878=
49) 915 x 313=
50) 804 x 980=




Answers

1) 210 * 311 = 65310 2) 469 * 908 = 425852 3) 392 * 616 = 241472 4) 864 * 150 = 129600 5) 750 * 933 = 699750 6) 355 * 635 = 225425 7) 757 * 956 = 723692 8) 413 * 449 = 185437 9) 604 * 397 = 239788 10) 710 * 226 = 160460 11) 568 * 443 = 251624 12) 775 * 981 = 760275 13) 695 * 629 = 437155 14) 873 * 533 = 465309 15) 599 * 750 = 449250 16) 353 * 216 = 76248 17) 560 * 393 = 220080 18) 268 * 163 = 43684 19) 710 * 717 = 509070 20) 620 * 916 = 567920 21) 635 * 822 = 521970 22) 727 * 157 = 114139 23) 428 * 125 = 53500 24) 174 * 782 = 136068 25) 538 * 676 = 363688 26) 261 * 436 = 113796 27) 709 * 174 = 123366 28) 436 * 745 = 324820 29) 776 * 640 = 496640 30) 780 * 275 = 214500 31) 474 * 842 = 399108 32) 711 * 393 = 279423 33) 532 * 995 = 529340 34) 978 * 661 = 646458 35) 783 * 287 = 224721 36) 546 * 711 = 388206 37) 697 * 460 = 320620 38) 248 * 982 = 243536 39) 701 * 400 = 280400 40) 868 * 537 = 466116 41) 565 * 707 = 399455 42) 207 * 327 = 67689 43) 748 * 329 = 246092 44) 790 * 174 = 137460 45) 207 * 344 = 71208 46) 831 * 109 = 90579 47) 148 * 891 = 131868 48) 804 * 878 = 705912 49) 915 * 313 = 286395 50) 804 * 980 = 787920

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 47

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 47