1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 48

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 48

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 18, 2020.

Questions

1) 330 x 299=
2) 163 x 821=
3) 617 x 526=
4) 293 x 406=
5) 374 x 997=
6) 615 x 606=
7) 733 x 146=
8) 775 x 524=
9) 541 x 844=
10) 461 x 591=
11) 124 x 399=
12) 746 x 557=
13) 776 x 136=
14) 840 x 154=
15) 191 x 179=
16) 935 x 786=
17) 985 x 556=
18) 678 x 623=
19) 924 x 590=
20) 805 x 542=
21) 907 x 286=
22) 973 x 769=
23) 322 x 305=
24) 383 x 162=
25) 927 x 102=
26) 554 x 275=
27) 392 x 258=
28) 732 x 415=
29) 345 x 136=
30) 770 x 713=
31) 184 x 574=
32) 435 x 617=
33) 166 x 319=
34) 477 x 908=
35) 694 x 226=
36) 513 x 924=
37) 545 x 875=
38) 142 x 665=
39) 954 x 186=
40) 760 x 227=
41) 706 x 897=
42) 590 x 565=
43) 403 x 183=
44) 282 x 526=
45) 650 x 670=
46) 440 x 581=
47) 225 x 630=
48) 603 x 745=
49) 647 x 756=
50) 361 x 385=




Answers

1) 330 * 299 = 98670 2) 163 * 821 = 133823 3) 617 * 526 = 324542 4) 293 * 406 = 118958 5) 374 * 997 = 372878 6) 615 * 606 = 372690 7) 733 * 146 = 107018 8) 775 * 524 = 406100 9) 541 * 844 = 456604 10) 461 * 591 = 272451 11) 124 * 399 = 49476 12) 746 * 557 = 415522 13) 776 * 136 = 105536 14) 840 * 154 = 129360 15) 191 * 179 = 34189 16) 935 * 786 = 734910 17) 985 * 556 = 547660 18) 678 * 623 = 422394 19) 924 * 590 = 545160 20) 805 * 542 = 436310 21) 907 * 286 = 259402 22) 973 * 769 = 748237 23) 322 * 305 = 98210 24) 383 * 162 = 62046 25) 927 * 102 = 94554 26) 554 * 275 = 152350 27) 392 * 258 = 101136 28) 732 * 415 = 303780 29) 345 * 136 = 46920 30) 770 * 713 = 549010 31) 184 * 574 = 105616 32) 435 * 617 = 268395 33) 166 * 319 = 52954 34) 477 * 908 = 433116 35) 694 * 226 = 156844 36) 513 * 924 = 474012 37) 545 * 875 = 476875 38) 142 * 665 = 94430 39) 954 * 186 = 177444 40) 760 * 227 = 172520 41) 706 * 897 = 633282 42) 590 * 565 = 333350 43) 403 * 183 = 73749 44) 282 * 526 = 148332 45) 650 * 670 = 435500 46) 440 * 581 = 255640 47) 225 * 630 = 141750 48) 603 * 745 = 449235 49) 647 * 756 = 489132 50) 361 * 385 = 138985

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 48

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 48