1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 49

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 49

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 19, 2020.

Questions

1) 959 x 558=
2) 484 x 353=
3) 470 x 140=
4) 900 x 184=
5) 369 x 196=
6) 391 x 509=
7) 693 x 910=
8) 459 x 304=
9) 169 x 376=
10) 211 x 218=
11) 758 x 224=
12) 669 x 183=
13) 685 x 481=
14) 859 x 311=
15) 311 x 841=
16) 126 x 648=
17) 909 x 593=
18) 736 x 717=
19) 305 x 767=
20) 524 x 238=
21) 246 x 639=
22) 294 x 208=
23) 254 x 121=
24) 280 x 395=
25) 876 x 181=
26) 501 x 118=
27) 521 x 691=
28) 983 x 728=
29) 689 x 647=
30) 791 x 261=
31) 114 x 994=
32) 670 x 223=
33) 524 x 179=
34) 775 x 333=
35) 507 x 318=
36) 535 x 921=
37) 387 x 529=
38) 212 x 396=
39) 420 x 116=
40) 547 x 875=
41) 672 x 691=
42) 712 x 405=
43) 480 x 708=
44) 192 x 361=
45) 896 x 786=
46) 936 x 723=
47) 582 x 385=
48) 325 x 984=
49) 988 x 132=
50) 765 x 578=




Answers

1) 959 * 558 = 535122 2) 484 * 353 = 170852 3) 470 * 140 = 65800 4) 900 * 184 = 165600 5) 369 * 196 = 72324 6) 391 * 509 = 199019 7) 693 * 910 = 630630 8) 459 * 304 = 139536 9) 169 * 376 = 63544 10) 211 * 218 = 45998 11) 758 * 224 = 169792 12) 669 * 183 = 122427 13) 685 * 481 = 329485 14) 859 * 311 = 267149 15) 311 * 841 = 261551 16) 126 * 648 = 81648 17) 909 * 593 = 539037 18) 736 * 717 = 527712 19) 305 * 767 = 233935 20) 524 * 238 = 124712 21) 246 * 639 = 157194 22) 294 * 208 = 61152 23) 254 * 121 = 30734 24) 280 * 395 = 110600 25) 876 * 181 = 158556 26) 501 * 118 = 59118 27) 521 * 691 = 360011 28) 983 * 728 = 715624 29) 689 * 647 = 445783 30) 791 * 261 = 206451 31) 114 * 994 = 113316 32) 670 * 223 = 149410 33) 524 * 179 = 93796 34) 775 * 333 = 258075 35) 507 * 318 = 161226 36) 535 * 921 = 492735 37) 387 * 529 = 204723 38) 212 * 396 = 83952 39) 420 * 116 = 48720 40) 547 * 875 = 478625 41) 672 * 691 = 464352 42) 712 * 405 = 288360 43) 480 * 708 = 339840 44) 192 * 361 = 69312 45) 896 * 786 = 704256 46) 936 * 723 = 676728 47) 582 * 385 = 224070 48) 325 * 984 = 319800 49) 988 * 132 = 130416 50) 765 * 578 = 442170

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 49

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 49