1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 5

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 5

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on September 5, 2020.

Questions

1) 332 x 517=
2) 833 x 430=
3) 181 x 880=
4) 118 x 360=
5) 455 x 642=
6) 391 x 663=
7) 612 x 497=
8) 375 x 838=
9) 446 x 701=
10) 203 x 809=
11) 725 x 896=
12) 759 x 945=
13) 253 x 662=
14) 150 x 556=
15) 600 x 334=
16) 235 x 154=
17) 266 x 685=
18) 666 x 328=
19) 447 x 491=
20) 251 x 125=
21) 125 x 989=
22) 328 x 328=
23) 285 x 646=
24) 365 x 968=
25) 866 x 749=
26) 133 x 678=
27) 410 x 966=
28) 297 x 686=
29) 977 x 116=
30) 112 x 304=
31) 801 x 323=
32) 210 x 304=
33) 669 x 416=
34) 907 x 800=
35) 285 x 575=
36) 350 x 165=
37) 882 x 459=
38) 796 x 567=
39) 784 x 270=
40) 372 x 238=
41) 252 x 403=
42) 332 x 803=
43) 157 x 282=
44) 122 x 397=
45) 390 x 339=
46) 873 x 603=
47) 885 x 443=
48) 104 x 825=
49) 640 x 176=
50) 393 x 454=




Answers

1) 332 * 517 = 171644 2) 833 * 430 = 358190 3) 181 * 880 = 159280 4) 118 * 360 = 42480 5) 455 * 642 = 292110 6) 391 * 663 = 259233 7) 612 * 497 = 304164 8) 375 * 838 = 314250 9) 446 * 701 = 312646 10) 203 * 809 = 164227 11) 725 * 896 = 649600 12) 759 * 945 = 717255 13) 253 * 662 = 167486 14) 150 * 556 = 83400 15) 600 * 334 = 200400 16) 235 * 154 = 36190 17) 266 * 685 = 182210 18) 666 * 328 = 218448 19) 447 * 491 = 219477 20) 251 * 125 = 31375 21) 125 * 989 = 123625 22) 328 * 328 = 107584 23) 285 * 646 = 184110 24) 365 * 968 = 353320 25) 866 * 749 = 648634 26) 133 * 678 = 90174 27) 410 * 966 = 396060 28) 297 * 686 = 203742 29) 977 * 116 = 113332 30) 112 * 304 = 34048 31) 801 * 323 = 258723 32) 210 * 304 = 63840 33) 669 * 416 = 278304 34) 907 * 800 = 725600 35) 285 * 575 = 163875 36) 350 * 165 = 57750 37) 882 * 459 = 404838 38) 796 * 567 = 451332 39) 784 * 270 = 211680 40) 372 * 238 = 88536 41) 252 * 403 = 101556 42) 332 * 803 = 266596 43) 157 * 282 = 44274 44) 122 * 397 = 48434 45) 390 * 339 = 132210 46) 873 * 603 = 526419 47) 885 * 443 = 392055 48) 104 * 825 = 85800 49) 640 * 176 = 112640 50) 393 * 454 = 178422

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 5

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 5