1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 50

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 50

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 20, 2020.

Questions

1) 869 x 316=
2) 605 x 181=
3) 156 x 327=
4) 121 x 578=
5) 762 x 941=
6) 342 x 467=
7) 448 x 267=
8) 224 x 616=
9) 317 x 913=
10) 324 x 419=
11) 498 x 948=
12) 799 x 187=
13) 934 x 340=
14) 349 x 347=
15) 407 x 267=
16) 877 x 762=
17) 478 x 149=
18) 942 x 113=
19) 614 x 328=
20) 381 x 477=
21) 341 x 249=
22) 861 x 496=
23) 601 x 529=
24) 755 x 639=
25) 582 x 127=
26) 404 x 510=
27) 473 x 776=
28) 615 x 420=
29) 611 x 631=
30) 723 x 368=
31) 929 x 560=
32) 913 x 488=
33) 915 x 396=
34) 832 x 932=
35) 261 x 343=
36) 457 x 100=
37) 402 x 955=
38) 697 x 135=
39) 772 x 825=
40) 879 x 729=
41) 476 x 250=
42) 684 x 692=
43) 936 x 798=
44) 106 x 614=
45) 503 x 792=
46) 777 x 297=
47) 822 x 493=
48) 210 x 888=
49) 154 x 662=
50) 157 x 176=




Answers

1) 869 * 316 = 274604 2) 605 * 181 = 109505 3) 156 * 327 = 51012 4) 121 * 578 = 69938 5) 762 * 941 = 717042 6) 342 * 467 = 159714 7) 448 * 267 = 119616 8) 224 * 616 = 137984 9) 317 * 913 = 289421 10) 324 * 419 = 135756 11) 498 * 948 = 472104 12) 799 * 187 = 149413 13) 934 * 340 = 317560 14) 349 * 347 = 121103 15) 407 * 267 = 108669 16) 877 * 762 = 668274 17) 478 * 149 = 71222 18) 942 * 113 = 106446 19) 614 * 328 = 201392 20) 381 * 477 = 181737 21) 341 * 249 = 84909 22) 861 * 496 = 427056 23) 601 * 529 = 317929 24) 755 * 639 = 482445 25) 582 * 127 = 73914 26) 404 * 510 = 206040 27) 473 * 776 = 367048 28) 615 * 420 = 258300 29) 611 * 631 = 385541 30) 723 * 368 = 266064 31) 929 * 560 = 520240 32) 913 * 488 = 445544 33) 915 * 396 = 362340 34) 832 * 932 = 775424 35) 261 * 343 = 89523 36) 457 * 100 = 45700 37) 402 * 955 = 383910 38) 697 * 135 = 94095 39) 772 * 825 = 636900 40) 879 * 729 = 640791 41) 476 * 250 = 119000 42) 684 * 692 = 473328 43) 936 * 798 = 746928 44) 106 * 614 = 65084 45) 503 * 792 = 398376 46) 777 * 297 = 230769 47) 822 * 493 = 405246 48) 210 * 888 = 186480 49) 154 * 662 = 101948 50) 157 * 176 = 27632

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 50

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 50