1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 51

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 51

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 21, 2020.

Questions

1) 771 x 565=
2) 617 x 391=
3) 258 x 353=
4) 308 x 651=
5) 562 x 715=
6) 733 x 192=
7) 740 x 891=
8) 660 x 182=
9) 397 x 801=
10) 635 x 404=
11) 572 x 151=
12) 124 x 376=
13) 637 x 442=
14) 843 x 328=
15) 204 x 406=
16) 723 x 501=
17) 418 x 827=
18) 335 x 216=
19) 335 x 226=
20) 943 x 242=
21) 389 x 506=
22) 255 x 387=
23) 211 x 317=
24) 731 x 918=
25) 841 x 827=
26) 685 x 639=
27) 946 x 786=
28) 460 x 440=
29) 444 x 418=
30) 176 x 350=
31) 274 x 266=
32) 144 x 253=
33) 650 x 551=
34) 686 x 722=
35) 692 x 784=
36) 249 x 377=
37) 587 x 570=
38) 599 x 620=
39) 489 x 137=
40) 367 x 834=
41) 327 x 581=
42) 213 x 777=
43) 722 x 698=
44) 207 x 164=
45) 695 x 720=
46) 394 x 811=
47) 369 x 533=
48) 410 x 630=
49) 776 x 593=
50) 610 x 562=




Answers

1) 771 * 565 = 435615 2) 617 * 391 = 241247 3) 258 * 353 = 91074 4) 308 * 651 = 200508 5) 562 * 715 = 401830 6) 733 * 192 = 140736 7) 740 * 891 = 659340 8) 660 * 182 = 120120 9) 397 * 801 = 317997 10) 635 * 404 = 256540 11) 572 * 151 = 86372 12) 124 * 376 = 46624 13) 637 * 442 = 281554 14) 843 * 328 = 276504 15) 204 * 406 = 82824 16) 723 * 501 = 362223 17) 418 * 827 = 345686 18) 335 * 216 = 72360 19) 335 * 226 = 75710 20) 943 * 242 = 228206 21) 389 * 506 = 196834 22) 255 * 387 = 98685 23) 211 * 317 = 66887 24) 731 * 918 = 671058 25) 841 * 827 = 695507 26) 685 * 639 = 437715 27) 946 * 786 = 743556 28) 460 * 440 = 202400 29) 444 * 418 = 185592 30) 176 * 350 = 61600 31) 274 * 266 = 72884 32) 144 * 253 = 36432 33) 650 * 551 = 358150 34) 686 * 722 = 495292 35) 692 * 784 = 542528 36) 249 * 377 = 93873 37) 587 * 570 = 334590 38) 599 * 620 = 371380 39) 489 * 137 = 66993 40) 367 * 834 = 306078 41) 327 * 581 = 189987 42) 213 * 777 = 165501 43) 722 * 698 = 503956 44) 207 * 164 = 33948 45) 695 * 720 = 500400 46) 394 * 811 = 319534 47) 369 * 533 = 196677 48) 410 * 630 = 258300 49) 776 * 593 = 460168 50) 610 * 562 = 342820

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 51

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 51