1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 52

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 52

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 22, 2020.

Questions

1) 716 x 244=
2) 936 x 109=
3) 235 x 716=
4) 913 x 920=
5) 761 x 843=
6) 164 x 841=
7) 123 x 204=
8) 910 x 341=
9) 338 x 893=
10) 110 x 974=
11) 190 x 627=
12) 174 x 660=
13) 533 x 561=
14) 614 x 886=
15) 359 x 108=
16) 531 x 612=
17) 415 x 363=
18) 302 x 923=
19) 159 x 170=
20) 684 x 500=
21) 954 x 133=
22) 489 x 133=
23) 710 x 608=
24) 638 x 625=
25) 525 x 816=
26) 653 x 995=
27) 677 x 499=
28) 379 x 941=
29) 566 x 960=
30) 251 x 570=
31) 920 x 502=
32) 579 x 167=
33) 464 x 259=
34) 557 x 754=
35) 288 x 732=
36) 573 x 285=
37) 926 x 500=
38) 713 x 570=
39) 430 x 849=
40) 429 x 818=
41) 453 x 380=
42) 514 x 804=
43) 294 x 638=
44) 835 x 122=
45) 172 x 852=
46) 476 x 473=
47) 838 x 894=
48) 133 x 681=
49) 291 x 394=
50) 197 x 404=




Answers

1) 716 * 244 = 174704 2) 936 * 109 = 102024 3) 235 * 716 = 168260 4) 913 * 920 = 839960 5) 761 * 843 = 641523 6) 164 * 841 = 137924 7) 123 * 204 = 25092 8) 910 * 341 = 310310 9) 338 * 893 = 301834 10) 110 * 974 = 107140 11) 190 * 627 = 119130 12) 174 * 660 = 114840 13) 533 * 561 = 299013 14) 614 * 886 = 544004 15) 359 * 108 = 38772 16) 531 * 612 = 324972 17) 415 * 363 = 150645 18) 302 * 923 = 278746 19) 159 * 170 = 27030 20) 684 * 500 = 342000 21) 954 * 133 = 126882 22) 489 * 133 = 65037 23) 710 * 608 = 431680 24) 638 * 625 = 398750 25) 525 * 816 = 428400 26) 653 * 995 = 649735 27) 677 * 499 = 337823 28) 379 * 941 = 356639 29) 566 * 960 = 543360 30) 251 * 570 = 143070 31) 920 * 502 = 461840 32) 579 * 167 = 96693 33) 464 * 259 = 120176 34) 557 * 754 = 419978 35) 288 * 732 = 210816 36) 573 * 285 = 163305 37) 926 * 500 = 463000 38) 713 * 570 = 406410 39) 430 * 849 = 365070 40) 429 * 818 = 350922 41) 453 * 380 = 172140 42) 514 * 804 = 413256 43) 294 * 638 = 187572 44) 835 * 122 = 101870 45) 172 * 852 = 146544 46) 476 * 473 = 225148 47) 838 * 894 = 749172 48) 133 * 681 = 90573 49) 291 * 394 = 114654 50) 197 * 404 = 79588

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 52

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 52