1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 53

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 53

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on October 23, 2020.

Questions

1) 167 x 306=
2) 835 x 474=
3) 313 x 986=
4) 678 x 680=
5) 210 x 609=
6) 893 x 641=
7) 105 x 351=
8) 712 x 817=
9) 933 x 580=
10) 660 x 762=
11) 108 x 109=
12) 274 x 978=
13) 972 x 563=
14) 114 x 600=
15) 505 x 316=
16) 636 x 788=
17) 397 x 789=
18) 482 x 714=
19) 977 x 697=
20) 515 x 504=
21) 725 x 826=
22) 286 x 680=
23) 704 x 392=
24) 126 x 212=
25) 565 x 489=
26) 911 x 560=
27) 988 x 176=
28) 576 x 167=
29) 436 x 676=
30) 868 x 311=
31) 274 x 847=
32) 563 x 222=
33) 569 x 235=
34) 318 x 278=
35) 353 x 222=
36) 184 x 156=
37) 111 x 528=
38) 232 x 850=
39) 612 x 177=
40) 762 x 554=
41) 389 x 914=
42) 285 x 856=
43) 461 x 150=
44) 873 x 726=
45) 641 x 539=
46) 295 x 748=
47) 432 x 767=
48) 833 x 323=
49) 471 x 709=
50) 337 x 192=




Answers

1) 167 * 306 = 51102 2) 835 * 474 = 395790 3) 313 * 986 = 308618 4) 678 * 680 = 461040 5) 210 * 609 = 127890 6) 893 * 641 = 572413 7) 105 * 351 = 36855 8) 712 * 817 = 581704 9) 933 * 580 = 541140 10) 660 * 762 = 502920 11) 108 * 109 = 11772 12) 274 * 978 = 267972 13) 972 * 563 = 547236 14) 114 * 600 = 68400 15) 505 * 316 = 159580 16) 636 * 788 = 501168 17) 397 * 789 = 313233 18) 482 * 714 = 344148 19) 977 * 697 = 680969 20) 515 * 504 = 259560 21) 725 * 826 = 598850 22) 286 * 680 = 194480 23) 704 * 392 = 275968 24) 126 * 212 = 26712 25) 565 * 489 = 276285 26) 911 * 560 = 510160 27) 988 * 176 = 173888 28) 576 * 167 = 96192 29) 436 * 676 = 294736 30) 868 * 311 = 269948 31) 274 * 847 = 232078 32) 563 * 222 = 124986 33) 569 * 235 = 133715 34) 318 * 278 = 88404 35) 353 * 222 = 78366 36) 184 * 156 = 28704 37) 111 * 528 = 58608 38) 232 * 850 = 197200 39) 612 * 177 = 108324 40) 762 * 554 = 422148 41) 389 * 914 = 355546 42) 285 * 856 = 243960 43) 461 * 150 = 69150 44) 873 * 726 = 633798 45) 641 * 539 = 345499 46) 295 * 748 = 220660 47) 432 * 767 = 331344 48) 833 * 323 = 269059 49) 471 * 709 = 333939 50) 337 * 192 = 64704

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 53

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 53