1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 54

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 54

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 24, 2020.

Questions

1) 979 x 214=
2) 141 x 367=
3) 485 x 997=
4) 310 x 119=
5) 844 x 322=
6) 391 x 595=
7) 860 x 337=
8) 678 x 423=
9) 156 x 650=
10) 845 x 980=
11) 440 x 428=
12) 952 x 293=
13) 828 x 110=
14) 976 x 829=
15) 151 x 185=
16) 368 x 398=
17) 218 x 722=
18) 455 x 471=
19) 395 x 323=
20) 634 x 754=
21) 772 x 928=
22) 382 x 400=
23) 209 x 470=
24) 792 x 976=
25) 868 x 961=
26) 242 x 382=
27) 418 x 864=
28) 754 x 642=
29) 236 x 548=
30) 136 x 677=
31) 658 x 418=
32) 188 x 514=
33) 406 x 581=
34) 464 x 951=
35) 467 x 975=
36) 386 x 437=
37) 507 x 206=
38) 546 x 912=
39) 965 x 735=
40) 638 x 937=
41) 665 x 656=
42) 330 x 214=
43) 114 x 398=
44) 487 x 813=
45) 784 x 608=
46) 493 x 343=
47) 183 x 790=
48) 175 x 117=
49) 238 x 678=
50) 534 x 110=




Answers

1) 979 * 214 = 209506 2) 141 * 367 = 51747 3) 485 * 997 = 483545 4) 310 * 119 = 36890 5) 844 * 322 = 271768 6) 391 * 595 = 232645 7) 860 * 337 = 289820 8) 678 * 423 = 286794 9) 156 * 650 = 101400 10) 845 * 980 = 828100 11) 440 * 428 = 188320 12) 952 * 293 = 278936 13) 828 * 110 = 91080 14) 976 * 829 = 809104 15) 151 * 185 = 27935 16) 368 * 398 = 146464 17) 218 * 722 = 157396 18) 455 * 471 = 214305 19) 395 * 323 = 127585 20) 634 * 754 = 478036 21) 772 * 928 = 716416 22) 382 * 400 = 152800 23) 209 * 470 = 98230 24) 792 * 976 = 772992 25) 868 * 961 = 834148 26) 242 * 382 = 92444 27) 418 * 864 = 361152 28) 754 * 642 = 484068 29) 236 * 548 = 129328 30) 136 * 677 = 92072 31) 658 * 418 = 275044 32) 188 * 514 = 96632 33) 406 * 581 = 235886 34) 464 * 951 = 441264 35) 467 * 975 = 455325 36) 386 * 437 = 168682 37) 507 * 206 = 104442 38) 546 * 912 = 497952 39) 965 * 735 = 709275 40) 638 * 937 = 597806 41) 665 * 656 = 436240 42) 330 * 214 = 70620 43) 114 * 398 = 45372 44) 487 * 813 = 395931 45) 784 * 608 = 476672 46) 493 * 343 = 169099 47) 183 * 790 = 144570 48) 175 * 117 = 20475 49) 238 * 678 = 161364 50) 534 * 110 = 58740

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 54

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 54