1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 55

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 55

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 25, 2020.

Questions

1) 159 x 800=
2) 600 x 229=
3) 804 x 583=
4) 639 x 775=
5) 317 x 311=
6) 610 x 877=
7) 645 x 356=
8) 623 x 233=
9) 838 x 790=
10) 403 x 625=
11) 588 x 395=
12) 292 x 165=
13) 555 x 621=
14) 270 x 653=
15) 608 x 566=
16) 530 x 326=
17) 433 x 469=
18) 930 x 501=
19) 308 x 279=
20) 132 x 797=
21) 730 x 772=
22) 601 x 266=
23) 411 x 353=
24) 956 x 229=
25) 409 x 167=
26) 113 x 250=
27) 555 x 404=
28) 986 x 168=
29) 172 x 915=
30) 684 x 731=
31) 778 x 626=
32) 253 x 523=
33) 827 x 588=
34) 338 x 889=
35) 911 x 796=
36) 175 x 917=
37) 920 x 548=
38) 116 x 634=
39) 528 x 449=
40) 877 x 834=
41) 615 x 102=
42) 236 x 485=
43) 178 x 441=
44) 899 x 805=
45) 803 x 820=
46) 872 x 140=
47) 775 x 874=
48) 910 x 112=
49) 502 x 687=
50) 839 x 679=




Answers

1) 159 * 800 = 127200 2) 600 * 229 = 137400 3) 804 * 583 = 468732 4) 639 * 775 = 495225 5) 317 * 311 = 98587 6) 610 * 877 = 534970 7) 645 * 356 = 229620 8) 623 * 233 = 145159 9) 838 * 790 = 662020 10) 403 * 625 = 251875 11) 588 * 395 = 232260 12) 292 * 165 = 48180 13) 555 * 621 = 344655 14) 270 * 653 = 176310 15) 608 * 566 = 344128 16) 530 * 326 = 172780 17) 433 * 469 = 203077 18) 930 * 501 = 465930 19) 308 * 279 = 85932 20) 132 * 797 = 105204 21) 730 * 772 = 563560 22) 601 * 266 = 159866 23) 411 * 353 = 145083 24) 956 * 229 = 218924 25) 409 * 167 = 68303 26) 113 * 250 = 28250 27) 555 * 404 = 224220 28) 986 * 168 = 165648 29) 172 * 915 = 157380 30) 684 * 731 = 500004 31) 778 * 626 = 487028 32) 253 * 523 = 132319 33) 827 * 588 = 486276 34) 338 * 889 = 300482 35) 911 * 796 = 725156 36) 175 * 917 = 160475 37) 920 * 548 = 504160 38) 116 * 634 = 73544 39) 528 * 449 = 237072 40) 877 * 834 = 731418 41) 615 * 102 = 62730 42) 236 * 485 = 114460 43) 178 * 441 = 78498 44) 899 * 805 = 723695 45) 803 * 820 = 658460 46) 872 * 140 = 122080 47) 775 * 874 = 677350 48) 910 * 112 = 101920 49) 502 * 687 = 344874 50) 839 * 679 = 569681

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 55

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 55