1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 56

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 56

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on October 26, 2020.

Questions

1) 267 x 251=
2) 941 x 933=
3) 787 x 892=
4) 912 x 359=
5) 912 x 854=
6) 462 x 989=
7) 495 x 300=
8) 744 x 316=
9) 820 x 615=
10) 303 x 153=
11) 279 x 784=
12) 682 x 522=
13) 498 x 339=
14) 567 x 553=
15) 112 x 352=
16) 620 x 997=
17) 310 x 339=
18) 800 x 840=
19) 648 x 922=
20) 337 x 990=
21) 228 x 423=
22) 124 x 196=
23) 499 x 461=
24) 767 x 697=
25) 323 x 882=
26) 176 x 905=
27) 606 x 305=
28) 547 x 587=
29) 995 x 904=
30) 630 x 706=
31) 168 x 463=
32) 854 x 168=
33) 665 x 655=
34) 953 x 813=
35) 441 x 756=
36) 207 x 990=
37) 933 x 601=
38) 975 x 946=
39) 768 x 635=
40) 926 x 150=
41) 388 x 451=
42) 615 x 737=
43) 818 x 751=
44) 368 x 979=
45) 103 x 442=
46) 250 x 991=
47) 281 x 535=
48) 385 x 406=
49) 986 x 201=
50) 881 x 824=




Answers

1) 267 * 251 = 67017 2) 941 * 933 = 877953 3) 787 * 892 = 702004 4) 912 * 359 = 327408 5) 912 * 854 = 778848 6) 462 * 989 = 456918 7) 495 * 300 = 148500 8) 744 * 316 = 235104 9) 820 * 615 = 504300 10) 303 * 153 = 46359 11) 279 * 784 = 218736 12) 682 * 522 = 356004 13) 498 * 339 = 168822 14) 567 * 553 = 313551 15) 112 * 352 = 39424 16) 620 * 997 = 618140 17) 310 * 339 = 105090 18) 800 * 840 = 672000 19) 648 * 922 = 597456 20) 337 * 990 = 333630 21) 228 * 423 = 96444 22) 124 * 196 = 24304 23) 499 * 461 = 230039 24) 767 * 697 = 534599 25) 323 * 882 = 284886 26) 176 * 905 = 159280 27) 606 * 305 = 184830 28) 547 * 587 = 321089 29) 995 * 904 = 899480 30) 630 * 706 = 444780 31) 168 * 463 = 77784 32) 854 * 168 = 143472 33) 665 * 655 = 435575 34) 953 * 813 = 774789 35) 441 * 756 = 333396 36) 207 * 990 = 204930 37) 933 * 601 = 560733 38) 975 * 946 = 922350 39) 768 * 635 = 487680 40) 926 * 150 = 138900 41) 388 * 451 = 174988 42) 615 * 737 = 453255 43) 818 * 751 = 614318 44) 368 * 979 = 360272 45) 103 * 442 = 45526 46) 250 * 991 = 247750 47) 281 * 535 = 150335 48) 385 * 406 = 156310 49) 986 * 201 = 198186 50) 881 * 824 = 725944

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 56

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 56