1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 57

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 57

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 27, 2020.

Questions

1) 943 x 878=
2) 650 x 489=
3) 822 x 809=
4) 197 x 132=
5) 438 x 947=
6) 216 x 614=
7) 664 x 587=
8) 391 x 674=
9) 294 x 926=
10) 444 x 305=
11) 308 x 495=
12) 703 x 282=
13) 363 x 300=
14) 251 x 616=
15) 720 x 167=
16) 722 x 225=
17) 699 x 369=
18) 278 x 847=
19) 593 x 620=
20) 167 x 339=
21) 980 x 497=
22) 480 x 382=
23) 117 x 300=
24) 823 x 894=
25) 907 x 662=
26) 948 x 819=
27) 218 x 929=
28) 704 x 981=
29) 214 x 142=
30) 838 x 840=
31) 416 x 788=
32) 191 x 110=
33) 810 x 588=
34) 183 x 658=
35) 750 x 586=
36) 323 x 609=
37) 876 x 536=
38) 386 x 307=
39) 318 x 649=
40) 341 x 585=
41) 799 x 670=
42) 114 x 735=
43) 552 x 634=
44) 476 x 357=
45) 427 x 301=
46) 641 x 422=
47) 731 x 680=
48) 749 x 294=
49) 301 x 416=
50) 896 x 205=




Answers

1) 943 * 878 = 827954 2) 650 * 489 = 317850 3) 822 * 809 = 664998 4) 197 * 132 = 26004 5) 438 * 947 = 414786 6) 216 * 614 = 132624 7) 664 * 587 = 389768 8) 391 * 674 = 263534 9) 294 * 926 = 272244 10) 444 * 305 = 135420 11) 308 * 495 = 152460 12) 703 * 282 = 198246 13) 363 * 300 = 108900 14) 251 * 616 = 154616 15) 720 * 167 = 120240 16) 722 * 225 = 162450 17) 699 * 369 = 257931 18) 278 * 847 = 235466 19) 593 * 620 = 367660 20) 167 * 339 = 56613 21) 980 * 497 = 487060 22) 480 * 382 = 183360 23) 117 * 300 = 35100 24) 823 * 894 = 735762 25) 907 * 662 = 600434 26) 948 * 819 = 776412 27) 218 * 929 = 202522 28) 704 * 981 = 690624 29) 214 * 142 = 30388 30) 838 * 840 = 703920 31) 416 * 788 = 327808 32) 191 * 110 = 21010 33) 810 * 588 = 476280 34) 183 * 658 = 120414 35) 750 * 586 = 439500 36) 323 * 609 = 196707 37) 876 * 536 = 469536 38) 386 * 307 = 118502 39) 318 * 649 = 206382 40) 341 * 585 = 199485 41) 799 * 670 = 535330 42) 114 * 735 = 83790 43) 552 * 634 = 349968 44) 476 * 357 = 169932 45) 427 * 301 = 128527 46) 641 * 422 = 270502 47) 731 * 680 = 497080 48) 749 * 294 = 220206 49) 301 * 416 = 125216 50) 896 * 205 = 183680

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 57

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 57