1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 58

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 58

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 28, 2020.

Questions

1) 504 x 251=
2) 626 x 824=
3) 976 x 290=
4) 929 x 733=
5) 947 x 337=
6) 748 x 801=
7) 173 x 344=
8) 152 x 186=
9) 947 x 160=
10) 668 x 435=
11) 954 x 575=
12) 332 x 624=
13) 362 x 881=
14) 756 x 500=
15) 510 x 368=
16) 513 x 885=
17) 306 x 484=
18) 964 x 863=
19) 228 x 223=
20) 277 x 638=
21) 844 x 604=
22) 298 x 717=
23) 524 x 382=
24) 206 x 476=
25) 132 x 924=
26) 675 x 126=
27) 329 x 156=
28) 160 x 830=
29) 191 x 862=
30) 584 x 489=
31) 545 x 768=
32) 277 x 315=
33) 931 x 792=
34) 594 x 336=
35) 644 x 982=
36) 758 x 946=
37) 225 x 853=
38) 204 x 964=
39) 269 x 692=
40) 791 x 579=
41) 791 x 719=
42) 834 x 206=
43) 355 x 860=
44) 280 x 394=
45) 520 x 246=
46) 660 x 978=
47) 613 x 560=
48) 884 x 573=
49) 425 x 964=
50) 442 x 678=




Answers

1) 504 * 251 = 126504 2) 626 * 824 = 515824 3) 976 * 290 = 283040 4) 929 * 733 = 680957 5) 947 * 337 = 319139 6) 748 * 801 = 599148 7) 173 * 344 = 59512 8) 152 * 186 = 28272 9) 947 * 160 = 151520 10) 668 * 435 = 290580 11) 954 * 575 = 548550 12) 332 * 624 = 207168 13) 362 * 881 = 318922 14) 756 * 500 = 378000 15) 510 * 368 = 187680 16) 513 * 885 = 454005 17) 306 * 484 = 148104 18) 964 * 863 = 831932 19) 228 * 223 = 50844 20) 277 * 638 = 176726 21) 844 * 604 = 509776 22) 298 * 717 = 213666 23) 524 * 382 = 200168 24) 206 * 476 = 98056 25) 132 * 924 = 121968 26) 675 * 126 = 85050 27) 329 * 156 = 51324 28) 160 * 830 = 132800 29) 191 * 862 = 164642 30) 584 * 489 = 285576 31) 545 * 768 = 418560 32) 277 * 315 = 87255 33) 931 * 792 = 737352 34) 594 * 336 = 199584 35) 644 * 982 = 632408 36) 758 * 946 = 717068 37) 225 * 853 = 191925 38) 204 * 964 = 196656 39) 269 * 692 = 186148 40) 791 * 579 = 457989 41) 791 * 719 = 568729 42) 834 * 206 = 171804 43) 355 * 860 = 305300 44) 280 * 394 = 110320 45) 520 * 246 = 127920 46) 660 * 978 = 645480 47) 613 * 560 = 343280 48) 884 * 573 = 506532 49) 425 * 964 = 409700 50) 442 * 678 = 299676

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 58

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 58