1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 59

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 59

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 29, 2020.

Questions

1) 823 x 482=
2) 155 x 632=
3) 971 x 442=
4) 132 x 426=
5) 902 x 461=
6) 985 x 928=
7) 866 x 778=
8) 670 x 324=
9) 419 x 961=
10) 758 x 753=
11) 575 x 221=
12) 208 x 981=
13) 745 x 932=
14) 112 x 808=
15) 743 x 100=
16) 906 x 229=
17) 995 x 833=
18) 661 x 786=
19) 760 x 602=
20) 975 x 989=
21) 302 x 942=
22) 475 x 178=
23) 260 x 925=
24) 469 x 424=
25) 344 x 725=
26) 261 x 606=
27) 341 x 313=
28) 525 x 218=
29) 960 x 694=
30) 998 x 599=
31) 237 x 925=
32) 859 x 625=
33) 482 x 192=
34) 322 x 538=
35) 193 x 952=
36) 377 x 204=
37) 111 x 581=
38) 147 x 142=
39) 467 x 380=
40) 522 x 102=
41) 960 x 263=
42) 327 x 128=
43) 900 x 622=
44) 431 x 180=
45) 637 x 646=
46) 228 x 827=
47) 910 x 503=
48) 587 x 473=
49) 560 x 574=
50) 846 x 992=




Answers

1) 823 * 482 = 396686 2) 155 * 632 = 97960 3) 971 * 442 = 429182 4) 132 * 426 = 56232 5) 902 * 461 = 415822 6) 985 * 928 = 914080 7) 866 * 778 = 673748 8) 670 * 324 = 217080 9) 419 * 961 = 402659 10) 758 * 753 = 570774 11) 575 * 221 = 127075 12) 208 * 981 = 204048 13) 745 * 932 = 694340 14) 112 * 808 = 90496 15) 743 * 100 = 74300 16) 906 * 229 = 207474 17) 995 * 833 = 828835 18) 661 * 786 = 519546 19) 760 * 602 = 457520 20) 975 * 989 = 964275 21) 302 * 942 = 284484 22) 475 * 178 = 84550 23) 260 * 925 = 240500 24) 469 * 424 = 198856 25) 344 * 725 = 249400 26) 261 * 606 = 158166 27) 341 * 313 = 106733 28) 525 * 218 = 114450 29) 960 * 694 = 666240 30) 998 * 599 = 597802 31) 237 * 925 = 219225 32) 859 * 625 = 536875 33) 482 * 192 = 92544 34) 322 * 538 = 173236 35) 193 * 952 = 183736 36) 377 * 204 = 76908 37) 111 * 581 = 64491 38) 147 * 142 = 20874 39) 467 * 380 = 177460 40) 522 * 102 = 53244 41) 960 * 263 = 252480 42) 327 * 128 = 41856 43) 900 * 622 = 559800 44) 431 * 180 = 77580 45) 637 * 646 = 411502 46) 228 * 827 = 188556 47) 910 * 503 = 457730 48) 587 * 473 = 277651 49) 560 * 574 = 321440 50) 846 * 992 = 839232

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 59

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 59