1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 6

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 6

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on September 6, 2020.

Questions

1) 874 x 730=
2) 460 x 674=
3) 861 x 967=
4) 474 x 456=
5) 768 x 414=
6) 526 x 551=
7) 689 x 325=
8) 633 x 126=
9) 220 x 769=
10) 177 x 424=
11) 144 x 536=
12) 452 x 236=
13) 718 x 218=
14) 668 x 277=
15) 252 x 248=
16) 831 x 850=
17) 407 x 271=
18) 506 x 521=
19) 335 x 709=
20) 348 x 926=
21) 199 x 100=
22) 185 x 698=
23) 717 x 173=
24) 896 x 759=
25) 363 x 766=
26) 886 x 963=
27) 492 x 310=
28) 722 x 238=
29) 545 x 189=
30) 167 x 562=
31) 621 x 273=
32) 133 x 126=
33) 646 x 419=
34) 154 x 856=
35) 578 x 621=
36) 891 x 284=
37) 983 x 266=
38) 464 x 748=
39) 353 x 509=
40) 515 x 537=
41) 645 x 684=
42) 852 x 912=
43) 290 x 706=
44) 892 x 654=
45) 959 x 286=
46) 467 x 356=
47) 592 x 380=
48) 191 x 978=
49) 196 x 657=
50) 657 x 852=




Answers

1) 874 * 730 = 638020 2) 460 * 674 = 310040 3) 861 * 967 = 832587 4) 474 * 456 = 216144 5) 768 * 414 = 317952 6) 526 * 551 = 289826 7) 689 * 325 = 223925 8) 633 * 126 = 79758 9) 220 * 769 = 169180 10) 177 * 424 = 75048 11) 144 * 536 = 77184 12) 452 * 236 = 106672 13) 718 * 218 = 156524 14) 668 * 277 = 185036 15) 252 * 248 = 62496 16) 831 * 850 = 706350 17) 407 * 271 = 110297 18) 506 * 521 = 263626 19) 335 * 709 = 237515 20) 348 * 926 = 322248 21) 199 * 100 = 19900 22) 185 * 698 = 129130 23) 717 * 173 = 124041 24) 896 * 759 = 680064 25) 363 * 766 = 278058 26) 886 * 963 = 853218 27) 492 * 310 = 152520 28) 722 * 238 = 171836 29) 545 * 189 = 103005 30) 167 * 562 = 93854 31) 621 * 273 = 169533 32) 133 * 126 = 16758 33) 646 * 419 = 270674 34) 154 * 856 = 131824 35) 578 * 621 = 358938 36) 891 * 284 = 253044 37) 983 * 266 = 261478 38) 464 * 748 = 347072 39) 353 * 509 = 179677 40) 515 * 537 = 276555 41) 645 * 684 = 441180 42) 852 * 912 = 777024 43) 290 * 706 = 204740 44) 892 * 654 = 583368 45) 959 * 286 = 274274 46) 467 * 356 = 166252 47) 592 * 380 = 224960 48) 191 * 978 = 186798 49) 196 * 657 = 128772 50) 657 * 852 = 559764

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 6

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 6