1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 60

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 60

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 30, 2020.

Questions

1) 650 x 670=
2) 969 x 341=
3) 641 x 770=
4) 216 x 980=
5) 528 x 258=
6) 942 x 590=
7) 298 x 674=
8) 102 x 976=
9) 927 x 472=
10) 767 x 441=
11) 275 x 556=
12) 266 x 917=
13) 307 x 351=
14) 544 x 561=
15) 767 x 269=
16) 511 x 585=
17) 503 x 245=
18) 221 x 961=
19) 113 x 569=
20) 567 x 328=
21) 742 x 720=
22) 161 x 468=
23) 765 x 149=
24) 662 x 414=
25) 221 x 881=
26) 601 x 202=
27) 893 x 366=
28) 857 x 427=
29) 542 x 236=
30) 842 x 799=
31) 717 x 554=
32) 684 x 784=
33) 122 x 399=
34) 700 x 375=
35) 736 x 589=
36) 692 x 509=
37) 219 x 340=
38) 233 x 965=
39) 541 x 671=
40) 176 x 415=
41) 779 x 469=
42) 453 x 446=
43) 433 x 523=
44) 937 x 263=
45) 753 x 286=
46) 775 x 481=
47) 952 x 119=
48) 394 x 645=
49) 456 x 538=
50) 469 x 118=




Answers

1) 650 * 670 = 435500 2) 969 * 341 = 330429 3) 641 * 770 = 493570 4) 216 * 980 = 211680 5) 528 * 258 = 136224 6) 942 * 590 = 555780 7) 298 * 674 = 200852 8) 102 * 976 = 99552 9) 927 * 472 = 437544 10) 767 * 441 = 338247 11) 275 * 556 = 152900 12) 266 * 917 = 243922 13) 307 * 351 = 107757 14) 544 * 561 = 305184 15) 767 * 269 = 206323 16) 511 * 585 = 298935 17) 503 * 245 = 123235 18) 221 * 961 = 212381 19) 113 * 569 = 64297 20) 567 * 328 = 185976 21) 742 * 720 = 534240 22) 161 * 468 = 75348 23) 765 * 149 = 113985 24) 662 * 414 = 274068 25) 221 * 881 = 194701 26) 601 * 202 = 121402 27) 893 * 366 = 326838 28) 857 * 427 = 365939 29) 542 * 236 = 127912 30) 842 * 799 = 672758 31) 717 * 554 = 397218 32) 684 * 784 = 536256 33) 122 * 399 = 48678 34) 700 * 375 = 262500 35) 736 * 589 = 433504 36) 692 * 509 = 352228 37) 219 * 340 = 74460 38) 233 * 965 = 224845 39) 541 * 671 = 363011 40) 176 * 415 = 73040 41) 779 * 469 = 365351 42) 453 * 446 = 202038 43) 433 * 523 = 226459 44) 937 * 263 = 246431 45) 753 * 286 = 215358 46) 775 * 481 = 372775 47) 952 * 119 = 113288 48) 394 * 645 = 254130 49) 456 * 538 = 245328 50) 469 * 118 = 55342

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 60

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 60