1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 61

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 61

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on October 31, 2020.

Questions

1) 731 x 203=
2) 291 x 550=
3) 436 x 141=
4) 162 x 649=
5) 865 x 600=
6) 544 x 427=
7) 657 x 289=
8) 649 x 433=
9) 565 x 378=
10) 139 x 873=
11) 589 x 730=
12) 299 x 103=
13) 296 x 714=
14) 333 x 827=
15) 901 x 633=
16) 159 x 246=
17) 535 x 867=
18) 154 x 377=
19) 491 x 240=
20) 892 x 381=
21) 117 x 646=
22) 872 x 839=
23) 514 x 551=
24) 648 x 797=
25) 442 x 264=
26) 811 x 999=
27) 698 x 552=
28) 672 x 823=
29) 331 x 413=
30) 663 x 457=
31) 793 x 375=
32) 419 x 142=
33) 228 x 585=
34) 428 x 622=
35) 413 x 295=
36) 777 x 659=
37) 392 x 653=
38) 487 x 652=
39) 165 x 278=
40) 770 x 916=
41) 854 x 338=
42) 109 x 877=
43) 264 x 204=
44) 654 x 574=
45) 190 x 986=
46) 662 x 278=
47) 311 x 866=
48) 817 x 360=
49) 142 x 616=
50) 529 x 519=




Answers

1) 731 * 203 = 148393 2) 291 * 550 = 160050 3) 436 * 141 = 61476 4) 162 * 649 = 105138 5) 865 * 600 = 519000 6) 544 * 427 = 232288 7) 657 * 289 = 189873 8) 649 * 433 = 281017 9) 565 * 378 = 213570 10) 139 * 873 = 121347 11) 589 * 730 = 429970 12) 299 * 103 = 30797 13) 296 * 714 = 211344 14) 333 * 827 = 275391 15) 901 * 633 = 570333 16) 159 * 246 = 39114 17) 535 * 867 = 463845 18) 154 * 377 = 58058 19) 491 * 240 = 117840 20) 892 * 381 = 339852 21) 117 * 646 = 75582 22) 872 * 839 = 731608 23) 514 * 551 = 283214 24) 648 * 797 = 516456 25) 442 * 264 = 116688 26) 811 * 999 = 810189 27) 698 * 552 = 385296 28) 672 * 823 = 553056 29) 331 * 413 = 136703 30) 663 * 457 = 302991 31) 793 * 375 = 297375 32) 419 * 142 = 59498 33) 228 * 585 = 133380 34) 428 * 622 = 266216 35) 413 * 295 = 121835 36) 777 * 659 = 512043 37) 392 * 653 = 255976 38) 487 * 652 = 317524 39) 165 * 278 = 45870 40) 770 * 916 = 705320 41) 854 * 338 = 288652 42) 109 * 877 = 95593 43) 264 * 204 = 53856 44) 654 * 574 = 375396 45) 190 * 986 = 187340 46) 662 * 278 = 184036 47) 311 * 866 = 269326 48) 817 * 360 = 294120 49) 142 * 616 = 87472 50) 529 * 519 = 274551

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 61

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 61