1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 62

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 62

Last updated on December 3, 2020. Created on November 1, 2020.

Questions

1) 217 x 344=
2) 360 x 458=
3) 520 x 451=
4) 413 x 131=
5) 518 x 167=
6) 736 x 433=
7) 932 x 894=
8) 551 x 305=
9) 166 x 512=
10) 266 x 434=
11) 481 x 425=
12) 921 x 228=
13) 192 x 662=
14) 499 x 719=
15) 780 x 691=
16) 825 x 722=
17) 994 x 554=
18) 285 x 886=
19) 860 x 957=
20) 442 x 623=
21) 568 x 256=
22) 374 x 568=
23) 891 x 210=
24) 477 x 884=
25) 857 x 936=
26) 328 x 604=
27) 188 x 422=
28) 496 x 114=
29) 222 x 651=
30) 291 x 963=
31) 561 x 566=
32) 885 x 410=
33) 170 x 652=
34) 538 x 748=
35) 353 x 985=
36) 591 x 417=
37) 966 x 985=
38) 464 x 655=
39) 475 x 715=
40) 806 x 746=
41) 284 x 944=
42) 238 x 394=
43) 789 x 919=
44) 549 x 743=
45) 206 x 936=
46) 981 x 222=
47) 732 x 756=
48) 595 x 328=
49) 676 x 997=
50) 326 x 162=




Answers

1) 217 * 344 = 74648 2) 360 * 458 = 164880 3) 520 * 451 = 234520 4) 413 * 131 = 54103 5) 518 * 167 = 86506 6) 736 * 433 = 318688 7) 932 * 894 = 833208 8) 551 * 305 = 168055 9) 166 * 512 = 84992 10) 266 * 434 = 115444 11) 481 * 425 = 204425 12) 921 * 228 = 209988 13) 192 * 662 = 127104 14) 499 * 719 = 358781 15) 780 * 691 = 538980 16) 825 * 722 = 595650 17) 994 * 554 = 550676 18) 285 * 886 = 252510 19) 860 * 957 = 823020 20) 442 * 623 = 275366 21) 568 * 256 = 145408 22) 374 * 568 = 212432 23) 891 * 210 = 187110 24) 477 * 884 = 421668 25) 857 * 936 = 802152 26) 328 * 604 = 198112 27) 188 * 422 = 79336 28) 496 * 114 = 56544 29) 222 * 651 = 144522 30) 291 * 963 = 280233 31) 561 * 566 = 317526 32) 885 * 410 = 362850 33) 170 * 652 = 110840 34) 538 * 748 = 402424 35) 353 * 985 = 347705 36) 591 * 417 = 246447 37) 966 * 985 = 951510 38) 464 * 655 = 303920 39) 475 * 715 = 339625 40) 806 * 746 = 601276 41) 284 * 944 = 268096 42) 238 * 394 = 93772 43) 789 * 919 = 725091 44) 549 * 743 = 407907 45) 206 * 936 = 192816 46) 981 * 222 = 217782 47) 732 * 756 = 553392 48) 595 * 328 = 195160 49) 676 * 997 = 673972 50) 326 * 162 = 52812

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 62

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 62