1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 63

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 63

Last updated on December 3, 2020. Created on November 2, 2020.

Questions

1) 881 x 229=
2) 507 x 109=
3) 230 x 159=
4) 846 x 226=
5) 115 x 531=
6) 322 x 757=
7) 890 x 822=
8) 451 x 109=
9) 499 x 775=
10) 905 x 792=
11) 578 x 264=
12) 764 x 667=
13) 602 x 698=
14) 610 x 311=
15) 917 x 744=
16) 762 x 680=
17) 930 x 754=
18) 672 x 993=
19) 919 x 779=
20) 166 x 728=
21) 490 x 290=
22) 505 x 977=
23) 385 x 554=
24) 214 x 837=
25) 557 x 948=
26) 930 x 834=
27) 629 x 685=
28) 804 x 479=
29) 749 x 701=
30) 596 x 895=
31) 572 x 365=
32) 848 x 107=
33) 748 x 429=
34) 184 x 242=
35) 543 x 713=
36) 218 x 209=
37) 802 x 845=
38) 617 x 680=
39) 721 x 742=
40) 501 x 596=
41) 508 x 823=
42) 792 x 437=
43) 929 x 878=
44) 659 x 129=
45) 365 x 324=
46) 424 x 751=
47) 533 x 547=
48) 141 x 611=
49) 493 x 214=
50) 418 x 417=




Answers

1) 881 * 229 = 201749 2) 507 * 109 = 55263 3) 230 * 159 = 36570 4) 846 * 226 = 191196 5) 115 * 531 = 61065 6) 322 * 757 = 243754 7) 890 * 822 = 731580 8) 451 * 109 = 49159 9) 499 * 775 = 386725 10) 905 * 792 = 716760 11) 578 * 264 = 152592 12) 764 * 667 = 509588 13) 602 * 698 = 420196 14) 610 * 311 = 189710 15) 917 * 744 = 682248 16) 762 * 680 = 518160 17) 930 * 754 = 701220 18) 672 * 993 = 667296 19) 919 * 779 = 715901 20) 166 * 728 = 120848 21) 490 * 290 = 142100 22) 505 * 977 = 493385 23) 385 * 554 = 213290 24) 214 * 837 = 179118 25) 557 * 948 = 528036 26) 930 * 834 = 775620 27) 629 * 685 = 430865 28) 804 * 479 = 385116 29) 749 * 701 = 525049 30) 596 * 895 = 533420 31) 572 * 365 = 208780 32) 848 * 107 = 90736 33) 748 * 429 = 320892 34) 184 * 242 = 44528 35) 543 * 713 = 387159 36) 218 * 209 = 45562 37) 802 * 845 = 677690 38) 617 * 680 = 419560 39) 721 * 742 = 534982 40) 501 * 596 = 298596 41) 508 * 823 = 418084 42) 792 * 437 = 346104 43) 929 * 878 = 815662 44) 659 * 129 = 85011 45) 365 * 324 = 118260 46) 424 * 751 = 318424 47) 533 * 547 = 291551 48) 141 * 611 = 86151 49) 493 * 214 = 105502 50) 418 * 417 = 174306

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 63

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 63