1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 64

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 64

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on November 3, 2020.

Questions

1) 686 x 165=
2) 732 x 797=
3) 540 x 127=
4) 523 x 990=
5) 662 x 749=
6) 537 x 567=
7) 906 x 759=
8) 415 x 777=
9) 646 x 267=
10) 328 x 588=
11) 737 x 973=
12) 488 x 390=
13) 625 x 123=
14) 197 x 724=
15) 105 x 392=
16) 216 x 679=
17) 175 x 643=
18) 613 x 366=
19) 596 x 940=
20) 528 x 228=
21) 473 x 745=
22) 476 x 314=
23) 999 x 807=
24) 759 x 623=
25) 924 x 401=
26) 879 x 340=
27) 420 x 703=
28) 533 x 289=
29) 309 x 700=
30) 431 x 409=
31) 438 x 112=
32) 794 x 971=
33) 738 x 604=
34) 372 x 119=
35) 353 x 696=
36) 647 x 287=
37) 188 x 875=
38) 630 x 424=
39) 627 x 613=
40) 132 x 465=
41) 797 x 820=
42) 315 x 305=
43) 727 x 563=
44) 163 x 183=
45) 745 x 158=
46) 824 x 266=
47) 845 x 504=
48) 504 x 861=
49) 205 x 298=
50) 830 x 380=




Answers

1) 686 * 165 = 113190 2) 732 * 797 = 583404 3) 540 * 127 = 68580 4) 523 * 990 = 517770 5) 662 * 749 = 495838 6) 537 * 567 = 304479 7) 906 * 759 = 687654 8) 415 * 777 = 322455 9) 646 * 267 = 172482 10) 328 * 588 = 192864 11) 737 * 973 = 717101 12) 488 * 390 = 190320 13) 625 * 123 = 76875 14) 197 * 724 = 142628 15) 105 * 392 = 41160 16) 216 * 679 = 146664 17) 175 * 643 = 112525 18) 613 * 366 = 224358 19) 596 * 940 = 560240 20) 528 * 228 = 120384 21) 473 * 745 = 352385 22) 476 * 314 = 149464 23) 999 * 807 = 806193 24) 759 * 623 = 472857 25) 924 * 401 = 370524 26) 879 * 340 = 298860 27) 420 * 703 = 295260 28) 533 * 289 = 154037 29) 309 * 700 = 216300 30) 431 * 409 = 176279 31) 438 * 112 = 49056 32) 794 * 971 = 770974 33) 738 * 604 = 445752 34) 372 * 119 = 44268 35) 353 * 696 = 245688 36) 647 * 287 = 185689 37) 188 * 875 = 164500 38) 630 * 424 = 267120 39) 627 * 613 = 384351 40) 132 * 465 = 61380 41) 797 * 820 = 653540 42) 315 * 305 = 96075 43) 727 * 563 = 409301 44) 163 * 183 = 29829 45) 745 * 158 = 117710 46) 824 * 266 = 219184 47) 845 * 504 = 425880 48) 504 * 861 = 433944 49) 205 * 298 = 61090 50) 830 * 380 = 315400

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 64

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 64