1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 65

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 65

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on November 4, 2020.

Questions

1) 899 x 516=
2) 775 x 255=
3) 951 x 363=
4) 174 x 786=
5) 779 x 396=
6) 399 x 206=
7) 723 x 659=
8) 329 x 483=
9) 463 x 871=
10) 511 x 920=
11) 346 x 846=
12) 955 x 831=
13) 609 x 601=
14) 658 x 630=
15) 760 x 493=
16) 935 x 876=
17) 861 x 530=
18) 420 x 424=
19) 746 x 206=
20) 342 x 998=
21) 849 x 196=
22) 108 x 506=
23) 127 x 919=
24) 207 x 760=
25) 183 x 220=
26) 638 x 468=
27) 627 x 527=
28) 374 x 904=
29) 570 x 639=
30) 552 x 237=
31) 591 x 586=
32) 811 x 545=
33) 831 x 539=
34) 621 x 953=
35) 683 x 451=
36) 316 x 915=
37) 263 x 823=
38) 556 x 152=
39) 346 x 404=
40) 278 x 623=
41) 918 x 607=
42) 103 x 489=
43) 410 x 107=
44) 631 x 219=
45) 692 x 259=
46) 652 x 133=
47) 292 x 717=
48) 514 x 770=
49) 373 x 809=
50) 688 x 600=




Answers

1) 899 * 516 = 463884 2) 775 * 255 = 197625 3) 951 * 363 = 345213 4) 174 * 786 = 136764 5) 779 * 396 = 308484 6) 399 * 206 = 82194 7) 723 * 659 = 476457 8) 329 * 483 = 158907 9) 463 * 871 = 403273 10) 511 * 920 = 470120 11) 346 * 846 = 292716 12) 955 * 831 = 793605 13) 609 * 601 = 366009 14) 658 * 630 = 414540 15) 760 * 493 = 374680 16) 935 * 876 = 819060 17) 861 * 530 = 456330 18) 420 * 424 = 178080 19) 746 * 206 = 153676 20) 342 * 998 = 341316 21) 849 * 196 = 166404 22) 108 * 506 = 54648 23) 127 * 919 = 116713 24) 207 * 760 = 157320 25) 183 * 220 = 40260 26) 638 * 468 = 298584 27) 627 * 527 = 330429 28) 374 * 904 = 338096 29) 570 * 639 = 364230 30) 552 * 237 = 130824 31) 591 * 586 = 346326 32) 811 * 545 = 441995 33) 831 * 539 = 447909 34) 621 * 953 = 591813 35) 683 * 451 = 308033 36) 316 * 915 = 289140 37) 263 * 823 = 216449 38) 556 * 152 = 84512 39) 346 * 404 = 139784 40) 278 * 623 = 173194 41) 918 * 607 = 557226 42) 103 * 489 = 50367 43) 410 * 107 = 43870 44) 631 * 219 = 138189 45) 692 * 259 = 179228 46) 652 * 133 = 86716 47) 292 * 717 = 209364 48) 514 * 770 = 395780 49) 373 * 809 = 301757 50) 688 * 600 = 412800

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 65

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 65