1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 66

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 66

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on November 5, 2020.

Questions

1) 704 x 266=
2) 442 x 853=
3) 593 x 531=
4) 548 x 970=
5) 718 x 235=
6) 515 x 605=
7) 388 x 679=
8) 465 x 975=
9) 373 x 520=
10) 171 x 613=
11) 300 x 521=
12) 542 x 107=
13) 539 x 397=
14) 947 x 661=
15) 878 x 682=
16) 103 x 571=
17) 420 x 764=
18) 310 x 463=
19) 781 x 408=
20) 282 x 238=
21) 445 x 993=
22) 537 x 358=
23) 332 x 916=
24) 674 x 139=
25) 520 x 319=
26) 782 x 896=
27) 694 x 585=
28) 327 x 291=
29) 106 x 145=
30) 470 x 302=
31) 717 x 537=
32) 685 x 386=
33) 592 x 576=
34) 399 x 383=
35) 163 x 703=
36) 415 x 113=
37) 473 x 905=
38) 129 x 435=
39) 990 x 599=
40) 422 x 894=
41) 478 x 185=
42) 445 x 179=
43) 531 x 993=
44) 704 x 228=
45) 374 x 174=
46) 425 x 230=
47) 307 x 641=
48) 672 x 822=
49) 496 x 541=
50) 466 x 564=




Answers

1) 704 * 266 = 187264 2) 442 * 853 = 377026 3) 593 * 531 = 314883 4) 548 * 970 = 531560 5) 718 * 235 = 168730 6) 515 * 605 = 311575 7) 388 * 679 = 263452 8) 465 * 975 = 453375 9) 373 * 520 = 193960 10) 171 * 613 = 104823 11) 300 * 521 = 156300 12) 542 * 107 = 57994 13) 539 * 397 = 213983 14) 947 * 661 = 625967 15) 878 * 682 = 598796 16) 103 * 571 = 58813 17) 420 * 764 = 320880 18) 310 * 463 = 143530 19) 781 * 408 = 318648 20) 282 * 238 = 67116 21) 445 * 993 = 441885 22) 537 * 358 = 192246 23) 332 * 916 = 304112 24) 674 * 139 = 93686 25) 520 * 319 = 165880 26) 782 * 896 = 700672 27) 694 * 585 = 405990 28) 327 * 291 = 95157 29) 106 * 145 = 15370 30) 470 * 302 = 141940 31) 717 * 537 = 385029 32) 685 * 386 = 264410 33) 592 * 576 = 340992 34) 399 * 383 = 152817 35) 163 * 703 = 114589 36) 415 * 113 = 46895 37) 473 * 905 = 428065 38) 129 * 435 = 56115 39) 990 * 599 = 593010 40) 422 * 894 = 377268 41) 478 * 185 = 88430 42) 445 * 179 = 79655 43) 531 * 993 = 527283 44) 704 * 228 = 160512 45) 374 * 174 = 65076 46) 425 * 230 = 97750 47) 307 * 641 = 196787 48) 672 * 822 = 552384 49) 496 * 541 = 268336 50) 466 * 564 = 262824

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 66

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 66