1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 67

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 67

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on November 6, 2020.

Questions

1) 736 x 140=
2) 175 x 833=
3) 631 x 375=
4) 889 x 124=
5) 110 x 838=
6) 321 x 378=
7) 129 x 746=
8) 147 x 938=
9) 239 x 845=
10) 129 x 460=
11) 477 x 555=
12) 837 x 392=
13) 964 x 457=
14) 914 x 332=
15) 495 x 110=
16) 808 x 102=
17) 204 x 956=
18) 348 x 553=
19) 192 x 865=
20) 935 x 691=
21) 455 x 266=
22) 733 x 476=
23) 274 x 437=
24) 798 x 755=
25) 718 x 268=
26) 175 x 395=
27) 690 x 666=
28) 258 x 452=
29) 492 x 212=
30) 353 x 210=
31) 452 x 579=
32) 341 x 548=
33) 632 x 525=
34) 113 x 339=
35) 590 x 310=
36) 427 x 728=
37) 506 x 750=
38) 798 x 716=
39) 922 x 711=
40) 229 x 139=
41) 556 x 421=
42) 560 x 538=
43) 605 x 709=
44) 914 x 580=
45) 608 x 972=
46) 388 x 289=
47) 886 x 457=
48) 722 x 654=
49) 232 x 380=
50) 250 x 667=




Answers

1) 736 * 140 = 103040 2) 175 * 833 = 145775 3) 631 * 375 = 236625 4) 889 * 124 = 110236 5) 110 * 838 = 92180 6) 321 * 378 = 121338 7) 129 * 746 = 96234 8) 147 * 938 = 137886 9) 239 * 845 = 201955 10) 129 * 460 = 59340 11) 477 * 555 = 264735 12) 837 * 392 = 328104 13) 964 * 457 = 440548 14) 914 * 332 = 303448 15) 495 * 110 = 54450 16) 808 * 102 = 82416 17) 204 * 956 = 195024 18) 348 * 553 = 192444 19) 192 * 865 = 166080 20) 935 * 691 = 646085 21) 455 * 266 = 121030 22) 733 * 476 = 348908 23) 274 * 437 = 119738 24) 798 * 755 = 602490 25) 718 * 268 = 192424 26) 175 * 395 = 69125 27) 690 * 666 = 459540 28) 258 * 452 = 116616 29) 492 * 212 = 104304 30) 353 * 210 = 74130 31) 452 * 579 = 261708 32) 341 * 548 = 186868 33) 632 * 525 = 331800 34) 113 * 339 = 38307 35) 590 * 310 = 182900 36) 427 * 728 = 310856 37) 506 * 750 = 379500 38) 798 * 716 = 571368 39) 922 * 711 = 655542 40) 229 * 139 = 31831 41) 556 * 421 = 234076 42) 560 * 538 = 301280 43) 605 * 709 = 428945 44) 914 * 580 = 530120 45) 608 * 972 = 590976 46) 388 * 289 = 112132 47) 886 * 457 = 404902 48) 722 * 654 = 472188 49) 232 * 380 = 88160 50) 250 * 667 = 166750

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 67

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 67