1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 68

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 68

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on November 7, 2020.

Questions

1) 946 x 744=
2) 432 x 776=
3) 403 x 966=
4) 203 x 810=
5) 258 x 952=
6) 226 x 517=
7) 397 x 873=
8) 607 x 181=
9) 702 x 296=
10) 963 x 618=
11) 502 x 330=
12) 984 x 919=
13) 745 x 523=
14) 892 x 713=
15) 388 x 332=
16) 662 x 160=
17) 350 x 629=
18) 786 x 996=
19) 345 x 349=
20) 332 x 191=
21) 593 x 389=
22) 503 x 635=
23) 323 x 495=
24) 431 x 663=
25) 407 x 383=
26) 572 x 369=
27) 128 x 138=
28) 797 x 905=
29) 139 x 933=
30) 204 x 326=
31) 492 x 330=
32) 261 x 287=
33) 205 x 700=
34) 331 x 915=
35) 914 x 186=
36) 285 x 462=
37) 655 x 852=
38) 651 x 337=
39) 941 x 688=
40) 200 x 815=
41) 233 x 735=
42) 602 x 603=
43) 130 x 949=
44) 353 x 926=
45) 137 x 869=
46) 420 x 637=
47) 930 x 343=
48) 196 x 856=
49) 184 x 259=
50) 614 x 462=




Answers

1) 946 * 744 = 703824 2) 432 * 776 = 335232 3) 403 * 966 = 389298 4) 203 * 810 = 164430 5) 258 * 952 = 245616 6) 226 * 517 = 116842 7) 397 * 873 = 346581 8) 607 * 181 = 109867 9) 702 * 296 = 207792 10) 963 * 618 = 595134 11) 502 * 330 = 165660 12) 984 * 919 = 904296 13) 745 * 523 = 389635 14) 892 * 713 = 635996 15) 388 * 332 = 128816 16) 662 * 160 = 105920 17) 350 * 629 = 220150 18) 786 * 996 = 782856 19) 345 * 349 = 120405 20) 332 * 191 = 63412 21) 593 * 389 = 230677 22) 503 * 635 = 319405 23) 323 * 495 = 159885 24) 431 * 663 = 285753 25) 407 * 383 = 155881 26) 572 * 369 = 211068 27) 128 * 138 = 17664 28) 797 * 905 = 721285 29) 139 * 933 = 129687 30) 204 * 326 = 66504 31) 492 * 330 = 162360 32) 261 * 287 = 74907 33) 205 * 700 = 143500 34) 331 * 915 = 302865 35) 914 * 186 = 170004 36) 285 * 462 = 131670 37) 655 * 852 = 558060 38) 651 * 337 = 219387 39) 941 * 688 = 647408 40) 200 * 815 = 163000 41) 233 * 735 = 171255 42) 602 * 603 = 363006 43) 130 * 949 = 123370 44) 353 * 926 = 326878 45) 137 * 869 = 119053 46) 420 * 637 = 267540 47) 930 * 343 = 318990 48) 196 * 856 = 167776 49) 184 * 259 = 47656 50) 614 * 462 = 283668

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 68

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 68