1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 69

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 69

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on November 8, 2020.

Questions

1) 412 x 168=
2) 849 x 799=
3) 169 x 816=
4) 651 x 133=
5) 688 x 738=
6) 216 x 193=
7) 899 x 514=
8) 854 x 378=
9) 472 x 238=
10) 983 x 881=
11) 124 x 640=
12) 255 x 983=
13) 885 x 674=
14) 410 x 220=
15) 297 x 630=
16) 754 x 405=
17) 481 x 689=
18) 711 x 605=
19) 201 x 120=
20) 926 x 796=
21) 728 x 468=
22) 614 x 872=
23) 495 x 410=
24) 325 x 707=
25) 466 x 148=
26) 825 x 484=
27) 458 x 229=
28) 248 x 715=
29) 443 x 344=
30) 390 x 529=
31) 156 x 366=
32) 420 x 402=
33) 600 x 143=
34) 721 x 315=
35) 694 x 163=
36) 797 x 648=
37) 686 x 624=
38) 951 x 569=
39) 882 x 949=
40) 844 x 925=
41) 300 x 138=
42) 663 x 112=
43) 638 x 477=
44) 318 x 376=
45) 246 x 207=
46) 326 x 925=
47) 719 x 163=
48) 273 x 386=
49) 651 x 164=
50) 958 x 138=




Answers

1) 412 * 168 = 69216 2) 849 * 799 = 678351 3) 169 * 816 = 137904 4) 651 * 133 = 86583 5) 688 * 738 = 507744 6) 216 * 193 = 41688 7) 899 * 514 = 462086 8) 854 * 378 = 322812 9) 472 * 238 = 112336 10) 983 * 881 = 866023 11) 124 * 640 = 79360 12) 255 * 983 = 250665 13) 885 * 674 = 596490 14) 410 * 220 = 90200 15) 297 * 630 = 187110 16) 754 * 405 = 305370 17) 481 * 689 = 331409 18) 711 * 605 = 430155 19) 201 * 120 = 24120 20) 926 * 796 = 737096 21) 728 * 468 = 340704 22) 614 * 872 = 535408 23) 495 * 410 = 202950 24) 325 * 707 = 229775 25) 466 * 148 = 68968 26) 825 * 484 = 399300 27) 458 * 229 = 104882 28) 248 * 715 = 177320 29) 443 * 344 = 152392 30) 390 * 529 = 206310 31) 156 * 366 = 57096 32) 420 * 402 = 168840 33) 600 * 143 = 85800 34) 721 * 315 = 227115 35) 694 * 163 = 113122 36) 797 * 648 = 516456 37) 686 * 624 = 428064 38) 951 * 569 = 541119 39) 882 * 949 = 837018 40) 844 * 925 = 780700 41) 300 * 138 = 41400 42) 663 * 112 = 74256 43) 638 * 477 = 304326 44) 318 * 376 = 119568 45) 246 * 207 = 50922 46) 326 * 925 = 301550 47) 719 * 163 = 117197 48) 273 * 386 = 105378 49) 651 * 164 = 106764 50) 958 * 138 = 132204

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 69

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 69