1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 7

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 7

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on September 7, 2020.

Questions

1) 809 x 557=
2) 765 x 105=
3) 129 x 406=
4) 930 x 306=
5) 186 x 777=
6) 578 x 190=
7) 128 x 622=
8) 860 x 880=
9) 936 x 200=
10) 324 x 958=
11) 855 x 372=
12) 172 x 323=
13) 183 x 302=
14) 234 x 220=
15) 221 x 739=
16) 114 x 861=
17) 144 x 257=
18) 208 x 715=
19) 251 x 351=
20) 105 x 173=
21) 824 x 290=
22) 755 x 758=
23) 209 x 128=
24) 327 x 789=
25) 620 x 439=
26) 537 x 750=
27) 757 x 941=
28) 166 x 997=
29) 491 x 928=
30) 787 x 674=
31) 830 x 704=
32) 618 x 982=
33) 466 x 751=
34) 810 x 372=
35) 442 x 415=
36) 479 x 118=
37) 769 x 328=
38) 914 x 698=
39) 522 x 745=
40) 857 x 978=
41) 322 x 292=
42) 401 x 874=
43) 486 x 471=
44) 469 x 729=
45) 960 x 484=
46) 627 x 626=
47) 272 x 957=
48) 588 x 607=
49) 755 x 448=
50) 466 x 665=




Answers

1) 809 * 557 = 450613 2) 765 * 105 = 80325 3) 129 * 406 = 52374 4) 930 * 306 = 284580 5) 186 * 777 = 144522 6) 578 * 190 = 109820 7) 128 * 622 = 79616 8) 860 * 880 = 756800 9) 936 * 200 = 187200 10) 324 * 958 = 310392 11) 855 * 372 = 318060 12) 172 * 323 = 55556 13) 183 * 302 = 55266 14) 234 * 220 = 51480 15) 221 * 739 = 163319 16) 114 * 861 = 98154 17) 144 * 257 = 37008 18) 208 * 715 = 148720 19) 251 * 351 = 88101 20) 105 * 173 = 18165 21) 824 * 290 = 238960 22) 755 * 758 = 572290 23) 209 * 128 = 26752 24) 327 * 789 = 258003 25) 620 * 439 = 272180 26) 537 * 750 = 402750 27) 757 * 941 = 712337 28) 166 * 997 = 165502 29) 491 * 928 = 455648 30) 787 * 674 = 530438 31) 830 * 704 = 584320 32) 618 * 982 = 606876 33) 466 * 751 = 349966 34) 810 * 372 = 301320 35) 442 * 415 = 183430 36) 479 * 118 = 56522 37) 769 * 328 = 252232 38) 914 * 698 = 637972 39) 522 * 745 = 388890 40) 857 * 978 = 838146 41) 322 * 292 = 94024 42) 401 * 874 = 350474 43) 486 * 471 = 228906 44) 469 * 729 = 341901 45) 960 * 484 = 464640 46) 627 * 626 = 392502 47) 272 * 957 = 260304 48) 588 * 607 = 356916 49) 755 * 448 = 338240 50) 466 * 665 = 309890

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 7

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 7