1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 70

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 70

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on November 9, 2020.

Questions

1) 993 x 796=
2) 443 x 409=
3) 489 x 337=
4) 585 x 355=
5) 152 x 433=
6) 124 x 966=
7) 332 x 919=
8) 867 x 316=
9) 217 x 790=
10) 720 x 346=
11) 503 x 366=
12) 343 x 590=
13) 859 x 748=
14) 353 x 502=
15) 407 x 845=
16) 864 x 678=
17) 985 x 676=
18) 375 x 453=
19) 182 x 723=
20) 994 x 302=
21) 977 x 586=
22) 588 x 877=
23) 698 x 171=
24) 200 x 229=
25) 814 x 569=
26) 418 x 505=
27) 951 x 415=
28) 134 x 690=
29) 737 x 567=
30) 545 x 558=
31) 799 x 617=
32) 461 x 392=
33) 835 x 523=
34) 689 x 435=
35) 338 x 180=
36) 479 x 859=
37) 351 x 255=
38) 204 x 592=
39) 250 x 650=
40) 281 x 276=
41) 875 x 807=
42) 465 x 483=
43) 657 x 512=
44) 848 x 319=
45) 461 x 994=
46) 796 x 529=
47) 897 x 230=
48) 732 x 593=
49) 336 x 623=
50) 552 x 768=




Answers

1) 993 * 796 = 790428 2) 443 * 409 = 181187 3) 489 * 337 = 164793 4) 585 * 355 = 207675 5) 152 * 433 = 65816 6) 124 * 966 = 119784 7) 332 * 919 = 305108 8) 867 * 316 = 273972 9) 217 * 790 = 171430 10) 720 * 346 = 249120 11) 503 * 366 = 184098 12) 343 * 590 = 202370 13) 859 * 748 = 642532 14) 353 * 502 = 177206 15) 407 * 845 = 343915 16) 864 * 678 = 585792 17) 985 * 676 = 665860 18) 375 * 453 = 169875 19) 182 * 723 = 131586 20) 994 * 302 = 300188 21) 977 * 586 = 572522 22) 588 * 877 = 515676 23) 698 * 171 = 119358 24) 200 * 229 = 45800 25) 814 * 569 = 463166 26) 418 * 505 = 211090 27) 951 * 415 = 394665 28) 134 * 690 = 92460 29) 737 * 567 = 417879 30) 545 * 558 = 304110 31) 799 * 617 = 492983 32) 461 * 392 = 180712 33) 835 * 523 = 436705 34) 689 * 435 = 299715 35) 338 * 180 = 60840 36) 479 * 859 = 411461 37) 351 * 255 = 89505 38) 204 * 592 = 120768 39) 250 * 650 = 162500 40) 281 * 276 = 77556 41) 875 * 807 = 706125 42) 465 * 483 = 224595 43) 657 * 512 = 336384 44) 848 * 319 = 270512 45) 461 * 994 = 458234 46) 796 * 529 = 421084 47) 897 * 230 = 206310 48) 732 * 593 = 434076 49) 336 * 623 = 209328 50) 552 * 768 = 423936

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 70

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 70