1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 71

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 71

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on November 10, 2020.

Questions

1) 224 x 350=
2) 347 x 471=
3) 943 x 512=
4) 914 x 737=
5) 481 x 471=
6) 181 x 455=
7) 322 x 150=
8) 519 x 225=
9) 626 x 313=
10) 605 x 328=
11) 299 x 760=
12) 543 x 449=
13) 406 x 587=
14) 917 x 783=
15) 638 x 851=
16) 583 x 549=
17) 843 x 361=
18) 920 x 949=
19) 167 x 557=
20) 355 x 99=
21) 869 x 570=
22) 817 x 744=
23) 488 x 909=
24) 632 x 436=
25) 190 x 111=
26) 281 x 521=
27) 952 x 432=
28) 694 x 192=
29) 485 x 232=
30) 992 x 355=
31) 870 x 373=
32) 802 x 110=
33) 620 x 982=
34) 556 x 929=
35) 212 x 353=
36) 706 x 601=
37) 478 x 600=
38) 288 x 718=
39) 910 x 535=
40) 440 x 260=
41) 436 x 986=
42) 559 x 600=
43) 845 x 907=
44) 186 x 763=
45) 363 x 718=
46) 543 x 465=
47) 562 x 186=
48) 485 x 179=
49) 163 x 917=
50) 889 x 710=




Answers

1) 224 * 350 = 78400 2) 347 * 471 = 163437 3) 943 * 512 = 482816 4) 914 * 737 = 673618 5) 481 * 471 = 226551 6) 181 * 455 = 82355 7) 322 * 150 = 48300 8) 519 * 225 = 116775 9) 626 * 313 = 195938 10) 605 * 328 = 198440 11) 299 * 760 = 227240 12) 543 * 449 = 243807 13) 406 * 587 = 238322 14) 917 * 783 = 718011 15) 638 * 851 = 542938 16) 583 * 549 = 320067 17) 843 * 361 = 304323 18) 920 * 949 = 873080 19) 167 * 557 = 93019 20) 355 * 99 = 35145 21) 869 * 570 = 495330 22) 817 * 744 = 607848 23) 488 * 909 = 443592 24) 632 * 436 = 275552 25) 190 * 111 = 21090 26) 281 * 521 = 146401 27) 952 * 432 = 411264 28) 694 * 192 = 133248 29) 485 * 232 = 112520 30) 992 * 355 = 352160 31) 870 * 373 = 324510 32) 802 * 110 = 88220 33) 620 * 982 = 608840 34) 556 * 929 = 516524 35) 212 * 353 = 74836 36) 706 * 601 = 424306 37) 478 * 600 = 286800 38) 288 * 718 = 206784 39) 910 * 535 = 486850 40) 440 * 260 = 114400 41) 436 * 986 = 429896 42) 559 * 600 = 335400 43) 845 * 907 = 766415 44) 186 * 763 = 141918 45) 363 * 718 = 260634 46) 543 * 465 = 252495 47) 562 * 186 = 104532 48) 485 * 179 = 86815 49) 163 * 917 = 149471 50) 889 * 710 = 631190

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 71

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 71