1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 72

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 72

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on November 11, 2020.

Questions

1) 353 x 859=
2) 824 x 960=
3) 347 x 379=
4) 846 x 990=
5) 818 x 733=
6) 241 x 833=
7) 862 x 141=
8) 112 x 799=
9) 588 x 589=
10) 324 x 418=
11) 641 x 722=
12) 706 x 308=
13) 108 x 568=
14) 661 x 110=
15) 344 x 668=
16) 732 x 894=
17) 782 x 705=
18) 778 x 733=
19) 307 x 833=
20) 291 x 805=
21) 688 x 617=
22) 581 x 641=
23) 347 x 884=
24) 143 x 942=
25) 579 x 771=
26) 287 x 820=
27) 573 x 218=
28) 139 x 130=
29) 395 x 870=
30) 152 x 715=
31) 136 x 161=
32) 433 x 310=
33) 953 x 292=
34) 226 x 594=
35) 776 x 957=
36) 300 x 634=
37) 369 x 516=
38) 327 x 221=
39) 148 x 953=
40) 730 x 247=
41) 847 x 668=
42) 271 x 455=
43) 439 x 339=
44) 232 x 388=
45) 389 x 828=
46) 937 x 977=
47) 727 x 794=
48) 734 x 835=
49) 274 x 422=
50) 288 x 602=




Answers

1) 353 * 859 = 303227 2) 824 * 960 = 791040 3) 347 * 379 = 131513 4) 846 * 990 = 837540 5) 818 * 733 = 599594 6) 241 * 833 = 200753 7) 862 * 141 = 121542 8) 112 * 799 = 89488 9) 588 * 589 = 346332 10) 324 * 418 = 135432 11) 641 * 722 = 462802 12) 706 * 308 = 217448 13) 108 * 568 = 61344 14) 661 * 110 = 72710 15) 344 * 668 = 229792 16) 732 * 894 = 654408 17) 782 * 705 = 551310 18) 778 * 733 = 570274 19) 307 * 833 = 255731 20) 291 * 805 = 234255 21) 688 * 617 = 424496 22) 581 * 641 = 372421 23) 347 * 884 = 306748 24) 143 * 942 = 134706 25) 579 * 771 = 446409 26) 287 * 820 = 235340 27) 573 * 218 = 124914 28) 139 * 130 = 18070 29) 395 * 870 = 343650 30) 152 * 715 = 108680 31) 136 * 161 = 21896 32) 433 * 310 = 134230 33) 953 * 292 = 278276 34) 226 * 594 = 134244 35) 776 * 957 = 742632 36) 300 * 634 = 190200 37) 369 * 516 = 190404 38) 327 * 221 = 72267 39) 148 * 953 = 141044 40) 730 * 247 = 180310 41) 847 * 668 = 565796 42) 271 * 455 = 123305 43) 439 * 339 = 148821 44) 232 * 388 = 90016 45) 389 * 828 = 322092 46) 937 * 977 = 915449 47) 727 * 794 = 577238 48) 734 * 835 = 612890 49) 274 * 422 = 115628 50) 288 * 602 = 173376

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 72

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 72