1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 73

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 73

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on November 12, 2020.

Questions

1) 556 x 407=
2) 262 x 928=
3) 562 x 518=
4) 266 x 683=
5) 660 x 717=
6) 428 x 540=
7) 656 x 948=
8) 224 x 319=
9) 577 x 943=
10) 484 x 976=
11) 827 x 651=
12) 295 x 648=
13) 673 x 697=
14) 232 x 649=
15) 868 x 701=
16) 451 x 627=
17) 376 x 128=
18) 595 x 608=
19) 659 x 311=
20) 497 x 927=
21) 909 x 159=
22) 604 x 552=
23) 114 x 904=
24) 309 x 944=
25) 896 x 573=
26) 650 x 458=
27) 211 x 997=
28) 122 x 620=
29) 969 x 469=
30) 688 x 379=
31) 963 x 731=
32) 819 x 282=
33) 280 x 229=
34) 659 x 284=
35) 499 x 944=
36) 694 x 813=
37) 182 x 509=
38) 381 x 114=
39) 420 x 656=
40) 175 x 847=
41) 446 x 182=
42) 370 x 777=
43) 341 x 831=
44) 523 x 991=
45) 960 x 263=
46) 563 x 241=
47) 905 x 558=
48) 782 x 718=
49) 156 x 712=
50) 502 x 404=




Answers

1) 556 * 407 = 226292 2) 262 * 928 = 243136 3) 562 * 518 = 291116 4) 266 * 683 = 181678 5) 660 * 717 = 473220 6) 428 * 540 = 231120 7) 656 * 948 = 621888 8) 224 * 319 = 71456 9) 577 * 943 = 544111 10) 484 * 976 = 472384 11) 827 * 651 = 538377 12) 295 * 648 = 191160 13) 673 * 697 = 469081 14) 232 * 649 = 150568 15) 868 * 701 = 608468 16) 451 * 627 = 282777 17) 376 * 128 = 48128 18) 595 * 608 = 361760 19) 659 * 311 = 204949 20) 497 * 927 = 460719 21) 909 * 159 = 144531 22) 604 * 552 = 333408 23) 114 * 904 = 103056 24) 309 * 944 = 291696 25) 896 * 573 = 513408 26) 650 * 458 = 297700 27) 211 * 997 = 210367 28) 122 * 620 = 75640 29) 969 * 469 = 454461 30) 688 * 379 = 260752 31) 963 * 731 = 703953 32) 819 * 282 = 230958 33) 280 * 229 = 64120 34) 659 * 284 = 187156 35) 499 * 944 = 471056 36) 694 * 813 = 564222 37) 182 * 509 = 92638 38) 381 * 114 = 43434 39) 420 * 656 = 275520 40) 175 * 847 = 148225 41) 446 * 182 = 81172 42) 370 * 777 = 287490 43) 341 * 831 = 283371 44) 523 * 991 = 518293 45) 960 * 263 = 252480 46) 563 * 241 = 135683 47) 905 * 558 = 504990 48) 782 * 718 = 561476 49) 156 * 712 = 111072 50) 502 * 404 = 202808

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 73

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 73