1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 74

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 74

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on November 13, 2020.

Questions

1) 516 x 552=
2) 421 x 168=
3) 611 x 491=
4) 154 x 963=
5) 912 x 566=
6) 407 x 402=
7) 157 x 810=
8) 119 x 663=
9) 577 x 711=
10) 930 x 619=
11) 536 x 810=
12) 222 x 167=
13) 316 x 994=
14) 750 x 526=
15) 707 x 211=
16) 939 x 101=
17) 531 x 262=
18) 396 x 988=
19) 267 x 562=
20) 929 x 240=
21) 454 x 795=
22) 532 x 247=
23) 134 x 355=
24) 208 x 477=
25) 483 x 634=
26) 102 x 629=
27) 863 x 816=
28) 377 x 127=
29) 783 x 242=
30) 162 x 236=
31) 104 x 945=
32) 763 x 618=
33) 663 x 598=
34) 544 x 506=
35) 573 x 311=
36) 107 x 385=
37) 160 x 966=
38) 257 x 526=
39) 211 x 593=
40) 517 x 825=
41) 564 x 573=
42) 169 x 853=
43) 121 x 398=
44) 368 x 527=
45) 306 x 350=
46) 932 x 114=
47) 126 x 308=
48) 118 x 799=
49) 943 x 330=
50) 901 x 500=




Answers

1) 516 * 552 = 284832 2) 421 * 168 = 70728 3) 611 * 491 = 300001 4) 154 * 963 = 148302 5) 912 * 566 = 516192 6) 407 * 402 = 163614 7) 157 * 810 = 127170 8) 119 * 663 = 78897 9) 577 * 711 = 410247 10) 930 * 619 = 575670 11) 536 * 810 = 434160 12) 222 * 167 = 37074 13) 316 * 994 = 314104 14) 750 * 526 = 394500 15) 707 * 211 = 149177 16) 939 * 101 = 94839 17) 531 * 262 = 139122 18) 396 * 988 = 391248 19) 267 * 562 = 150054 20) 929 * 240 = 222960 21) 454 * 795 = 360930 22) 532 * 247 = 131404 23) 134 * 355 = 47570 24) 208 * 477 = 99216 25) 483 * 634 = 306222 26) 102 * 629 = 64158 27) 863 * 816 = 704208 28) 377 * 127 = 47879 29) 783 * 242 = 189486 30) 162 * 236 = 38232 31) 104 * 945 = 98280 32) 763 * 618 = 471534 33) 663 * 598 = 396474 34) 544 * 506 = 275264 35) 573 * 311 = 178203 36) 107 * 385 = 41195 37) 160 * 966 = 154560 38) 257 * 526 = 135182 39) 211 * 593 = 125123 40) 517 * 825 = 426525 41) 564 * 573 = 323172 42) 169 * 853 = 144157 43) 121 * 398 = 48158 44) 368 * 527 = 193936 45) 306 * 350 = 107100 46) 932 * 114 = 106248 47) 126 * 308 = 38808 48) 118 * 799 = 94282 49) 943 * 330 = 311190 50) 901 * 500 = 450500

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 74

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 74