1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 75

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 75

Last updated on December 1, 2020. Created on November 14, 2020.

Questions

1) 798 x 944=
2) 296 x 466=
3) 366 x 106=
4) 605 x 162=
5) 257 x 510=
6) 836 x 808=
7) 136 x 984=
8) 993 x 312=
9) 481 x 340=
10) 113 x 583=
11) 469 x 464=
12) 769 x 848=
13) 789 x 593=
14) 480 x 234=
15) 416 x 176=
16) 213 x 639=
17) 786 x 447=
18) 128 x 838=
19) 284 x 433=
20) 968 x 239=
21) 978 x 572=
22) 958 x 303=
23) 838 x 906=
24) 510 x 547=
25) 514 x 865=
26) 855 x 748=
27) 776 x 485=
28) 696 x 576=
29) 913 x 741=
30) 418 x 362=
31) 694 x 883=
32) 99 x 243=
33) 835 x 894=
34) 515 x 262=
35) 475 x 914=
36) 348 x 533=
37) 596 x 181=
38) 931 x 226=
39) 385 x 397=
40) 251 x 246=
41) 265 x 111=
42) 217 x 896=
43) 945 x 206=
44) 307 x 833=
45) 104 x 301=
46) 132 x 817=
47) 912 x 602=
48) 670 x 872=
49) 299 x 176=
50) 105 x 765=




Answers

1) 798 * 944 = 753312 2) 296 * 466 = 137936 3) 366 * 106 = 38796 4) 605 * 162 = 98010 5) 257 * 510 = 131070 6) 836 * 808 = 675488 7) 136 * 984 = 133824 8) 993 * 312 = 309816 9) 481 * 340 = 163540 10) 113 * 583 = 65879 11) 469 * 464 = 217616 12) 769 * 848 = 652112 13) 789 * 593 = 467877 14) 480 * 234 = 112320 15) 416 * 176 = 73216 16) 213 * 639 = 136107 17) 786 * 447 = 351342 18) 128 * 838 = 107264 19) 284 * 433 = 122972 20) 968 * 239 = 231352 21) 978 * 572 = 559416 22) 958 * 303 = 290274 23) 838 * 906 = 759228 24) 510 * 547 = 278970 25) 514 * 865 = 444610 26) 855 * 748 = 639540 27) 776 * 485 = 376360 28) 696 * 576 = 400896 29) 913 * 741 = 676533 30) 418 * 362 = 151316 31) 694 * 883 = 612802 32) 99 * 243 = 24057 33) 835 * 894 = 746490 34) 515 * 262 = 134930 35) 475 * 914 = 434150 36) 348 * 533 = 185484 37) 596 * 181 = 107876 38) 931 * 226 = 210406 39) 385 * 397 = 152845 40) 251 * 246 = 61746 41) 265 * 111 = 29415 42) 217 * 896 = 194432 43) 945 * 206 = 194670 44) 307 * 833 = 255731 45) 104 * 301 = 31304 46) 132 * 817 = 107844 47) 912 * 602 = 549024 48) 670 * 872 = 584240 49) 299 * 176 = 52624 50) 105 * 765 = 80325

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 75

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 75