1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 76

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 76

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on November 15, 2020.

Questions

1) 582 x 969=
2) 175 x 655=
3) 955 x 990=
4) 672 x 242=
5) 406 x 963=
6) 455 x 442=
7) 828 x 875=
8) 863 x 130=
9) 787 x 593=
10) 789 x 99=
11) 984 x 387=
12) 565 x 514=
13) 289 x 258=
14) 417 x 734=
15) 199 x 364=
16) 977 x 372=
17) 593 x 838=
18) 285 x 865=
19) 667 x 665=
20) 368 x 780=
21) 913 x 402=
22) 246 x 136=
23) 633 x 278=
24) 801 x 536=
25) 415 x 457=
26) 582 x 910=
27) 225 x 886=
28) 445 x 508=
29) 927 x 151=
30) 631 x 102=
31) 291 x 285=
32) 458 x 507=
33) 738 x 801=
34) 576 x 204=
35) 374 x 853=
36) 911 x 896=
37) 701 x 309=
38) 669 x 699=
39) 196 x 651=
40) 362 x 130=
41) 182 x 759=
42) 423 x 936=
43) 338 x 137=
44) 737 x 361=
45) 731 x 719=
46) 858 x 778=
47) 720 x 209=
48) 525 x 811=
49) 190 x 252=
50) 440 x 774=




Answers

1) 582 * 969 = 563958 2) 175 * 655 = 114625 3) 955 * 990 = 945450 4) 672 * 242 = 162624 5) 406 * 963 = 390978 6) 455 * 442 = 201110 7) 828 * 875 = 724500 8) 863 * 130 = 112190 9) 787 * 593 = 466691 10) 789 * 99 = 78111 11) 984 * 387 = 380808 12) 565 * 514 = 290410 13) 289 * 258 = 74562 14) 417 * 734 = 306078 15) 199 * 364 = 72436 16) 977 * 372 = 363444 17) 593 * 838 = 496934 18) 285 * 865 = 246525 19) 667 * 665 = 443555 20) 368 * 780 = 287040 21) 913 * 402 = 367026 22) 246 * 136 = 33456 23) 633 * 278 = 175974 24) 801 * 536 = 429336 25) 415 * 457 = 189655 26) 582 * 910 = 529620 27) 225 * 886 = 199350 28) 445 * 508 = 226060 29) 927 * 151 = 139977 30) 631 * 102 = 64362 31) 291 * 285 = 82935 32) 458 * 507 = 232206 33) 738 * 801 = 591138 34) 576 * 204 = 117504 35) 374 * 853 = 319022 36) 911 * 896 = 816256 37) 701 * 309 = 216609 38) 669 * 699 = 467631 39) 196 * 651 = 127596 40) 362 * 130 = 47060 41) 182 * 759 = 138138 42) 423 * 936 = 395928 43) 338 * 137 = 46306 44) 737 * 361 = 266057 45) 731 * 719 = 525589 46) 858 * 778 = 667524 47) 720 * 209 = 150480 48) 525 * 811 = 425775 49) 190 * 252 = 47880 50) 440 * 774 = 340560

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 76

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 76