1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 77

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 77

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on November 16, 2020.

Questions

1) 371 x 344=
2) 294 x 184=
3) 432 x 226=
4) 841 x 318=
5) 482 x 388=
6) 858 x 380=
7) 746 x 860=
8) 927 x 957=
9) 127 x 743=
10) 515 x 965=
11) 758 x 786=
12) 762 x 740=
13) 891 x 461=
14) 658 x 524=
15) 669 x 122=
16) 589 x 786=
17) 832 x 176=
18) 815 x 797=
19) 117 x 771=
20) 458 x 152=
21) 494 x 362=
22) 285 x 240=
23) 893 x 666=
24) 317 x 344=
25) 415 x 430=
26) 831 x 286=
27) 114 x 910=
28) 280 x 197=
29) 179 x 173=
30) 364 x 137=
31) 243 x 307=
32) 133 x 220=
33) 100 x 873=
34) 491 x 104=
35) 418 x 867=
36) 639 x 665=
37) 244 x 733=
38) 431 x 847=
39) 584 x 931=
40) 578 x 930=
41) 299 x 118=
42) 276 x 874=
43) 202 x 192=
44) 187 x 466=
45) 509 x 641=
46) 352 x 551=
47) 891 x 292=
48) 238 x 892=
49) 957 x 834=
50) 841 x 439=




Answers

1) 371 * 344 = 127624 2) 294 * 184 = 54096 3) 432 * 226 = 97632 4) 841 * 318 = 267438 5) 482 * 388 = 187016 6) 858 * 380 = 326040 7) 746 * 860 = 641560 8) 927 * 957 = 887139 9) 127 * 743 = 94361 10) 515 * 965 = 496975 11) 758 * 786 = 595788 12) 762 * 740 = 563880 13) 891 * 461 = 410751 14) 658 * 524 = 344792 15) 669 * 122 = 81618 16) 589 * 786 = 462954 17) 832 * 176 = 146432 18) 815 * 797 = 649555 19) 117 * 771 = 90207 20) 458 * 152 = 69616 21) 494 * 362 = 178828 22) 285 * 240 = 68400 23) 893 * 666 = 594738 24) 317 * 344 = 109048 25) 415 * 430 = 178450 26) 831 * 286 = 237666 27) 114 * 910 = 103740 28) 280 * 197 = 55160 29) 179 * 173 = 30967 30) 364 * 137 = 49868 31) 243 * 307 = 74601 32) 133 * 220 = 29260 33) 100 * 873 = 87300 34) 491 * 104 = 51064 35) 418 * 867 = 362406 36) 639 * 665 = 424935 37) 244 * 733 = 178852 38) 431 * 847 = 365057 39) 584 * 931 = 543704 40) 578 * 930 = 537540 41) 299 * 118 = 35282 42) 276 * 874 = 241224 43) 202 * 192 = 38784 44) 187 * 466 = 87142 45) 509 * 641 = 326269 46) 352 * 551 = 193952 47) 891 * 292 = 260172 48) 238 * 892 = 212296 49) 957 * 834 = 798138 50) 841 * 439 = 369199

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 77

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 77