1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 78

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 78

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on November 17, 2020.

Questions

1) 721 x 948=
2) 977 x 532=
3) 699 x 114=
4) 99 x 163=
5) 404 x 454=
6) 951 x 822=
7) 700 x 174=
8) 408 x 597=
9) 326 x 587=
10) 628 x 107=
11) 482 x 830=
12) 128 x 404=
13) 594 x 155=
14) 492 x 711=
15) 920 x 845=
16) 615 x 823=
17) 146 x 248=
18) 586 x 776=
19) 130 x 224=
20) 895 x 482=
21) 975 x 820=
22) 217 x 293=
23) 474 x 792=
24) 246 x 523=
25) 727 x 648=
26) 177 x 258=
27) 293 x 499=
28) 298 x 665=
29) 945 x 578=
30) 989 x 99=
31) 383 x 170=
32) 313 x 671=
33) 443 x 897=
34) 169 x 442=
35) 161 x 714=
36) 722 x 326=
37) 768 x 693=
38) 411 x 963=
39) 944 x 576=
40) 624 x 695=
41) 850 x 104=
42) 840 x 861=
43) 304 x 269=
44) 258 x 501=
45) 416 x 265=
46) 393 x 394=
47) 669 x 904=
48) 540 x 743=
49) 985 x 662=
50) 229 x 419=




Answers

1) 721 * 948 = 683508 2) 977 * 532 = 519764 3) 699 * 114 = 79686 4) 99 * 163 = 16137 5) 404 * 454 = 183416 6) 951 * 822 = 781722 7) 700 * 174 = 121800 8) 408 * 597 = 243576 9) 326 * 587 = 191362 10) 628 * 107 = 67196 11) 482 * 830 = 400060 12) 128 * 404 = 51712 13) 594 * 155 = 92070 14) 492 * 711 = 349812 15) 920 * 845 = 777400 16) 615 * 823 = 506145 17) 146 * 248 = 36208 18) 586 * 776 = 454736 19) 130 * 224 = 29120 20) 895 * 482 = 431390 21) 975 * 820 = 799500 22) 217 * 293 = 63581 23) 474 * 792 = 375408 24) 246 * 523 = 128658 25) 727 * 648 = 471096 26) 177 * 258 = 45666 27) 293 * 499 = 146207 28) 298 * 665 = 198170 29) 945 * 578 = 546210 30) 989 * 99 = 97911 31) 383 * 170 = 65110 32) 313 * 671 = 210023 33) 443 * 897 = 397371 34) 169 * 442 = 74698 35) 161 * 714 = 114954 36) 722 * 326 = 235372 37) 768 * 693 = 532224 38) 411 * 963 = 395793 39) 944 * 576 = 543744 40) 624 * 695 = 433680 41) 850 * 104 = 88400 42) 840 * 861 = 723240 43) 304 * 269 = 81776 44) 258 * 501 = 129258 45) 416 * 265 = 110240 46) 393 * 394 = 154842 47) 669 * 904 = 604776 48) 540 * 743 = 401220 49) 985 * 662 = 652070 50) 229 * 419 = 95951

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 78

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 78