1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 79

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 79

Last updated on November 20, 2020. Created on November 18, 2020.

Questions

1) 520 x 133=
2) 961 x 937=
3) 450 x 958=
4) 938 x 429=
5) 947 x 303=
6) 965 x 905=
7) 770 x 744=
8) 215 x 544=
9) 511 x 523=
10) 990 x 348=
11) 497 x 200=
12) 343 x 590=
13) 204 x 480=
14) 436 x 198=
15) 177 x 834=
16) 496 x 869=
17) 936 x 345=
18) 591 x 574=
19) 745 x 755=
20) 285 x 188=
21) 809 x 902=
22) 847 x 523=
23) 837 x 303=
24) 652 x 130=
25) 895 x 150=
26) 317 x 658=
27) 441 x 703=
28) 583 x 700=
29) 891 x 833=
30) 215 x 726=
31) 636 x 776=
32) 903 x 780=
33) 617 x 659=
34) 433 x 888=
35) 923 x 781=
36) 904 x 553=
37) 277 x 958=
38) 392 x 837=
39) 582 x 598=
40) 428 x 630=
41) 122 x 603=
42) 776 x 411=
43) 316 x 476=
44) 498 x 247=
45) 984 x 622=
46) 541 x 724=
47) 292 x 550=
48) 397 x 970=
49) 830 x 389=
50) 776 x 291=




Answers

1) 520 * 133 = 69160 2) 961 * 937 = 900457 3) 450 * 958 = 431100 4) 938 * 429 = 402402 5) 947 * 303 = 286941 6) 965 * 905 = 873325 7) 770 * 744 = 572880 8) 215 * 544 = 116960 9) 511 * 523 = 267253 10) 990 * 348 = 344520 11) 497 * 200 = 99400 12) 343 * 590 = 202370 13) 204 * 480 = 97920 14) 436 * 198 = 86328 15) 177 * 834 = 147618 16) 496 * 869 = 431024 17) 936 * 345 = 322920 18) 591 * 574 = 339234 19) 745 * 755 = 562475 20) 285 * 188 = 53580 21) 809 * 902 = 729718 22) 847 * 523 = 442981 23) 837 * 303 = 253611 24) 652 * 130 = 84760 25) 895 * 150 = 134250 26) 317 * 658 = 208586 27) 441 * 703 = 310023 28) 583 * 700 = 408100 29) 891 * 833 = 742203 30) 215 * 726 = 156090 31) 636 * 776 = 493536 32) 903 * 780 = 704340 33) 617 * 659 = 406603 34) 433 * 888 = 384504 35) 923 * 781 = 720863 36) 904 * 553 = 499912 37) 277 * 958 = 265366 38) 392 * 837 = 328104 39) 582 * 598 = 348036 40) 428 * 630 = 269640 41) 122 * 603 = 73566 42) 776 * 411 = 318936 43) 316 * 476 = 150416 44) 498 * 247 = 123006 45) 984 * 622 = 612048 46) 541 * 724 = 391684 47) 292 * 550 = 160600 48) 397 * 970 = 385090 49) 830 * 389 = 322870 50) 776 * 291 = 225816

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 79

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 79