1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 8

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 8

Last updated on December 3, 2020. Created on September 8, 2020.

Questions

1) 312 x 691=
2) 345 x 606=
3) 158 x 472=
4) 234 x 924=
5) 262 x 184=
6) 660 x 261=
7) 644 x 613=
8) 663 x 216=
9) 167 x 254=
10) 537 x 126=
11) 865 x 362=
12) 518 x 429=
13) 906 x 745=
14) 275 x 340=
15) 642 x 133=
16) 366 x 281=
17) 984 x 375=
18) 592 x 916=
19) 378 x 470=
20) 244 x 472=
21) 704 x 644=
22) 103 x 304=
23) 838 x 196=
24) 871 x 724=
25) 357 x 730=
26) 975 x 659=
27) 956 x 245=
28) 907 x 980=
29) 919 x 340=
30) 617 x 758=
31) 235 x 323=
32) 319 x 679=
33) 828 x 978=
34) 319 x 411=
35) 583 x 120=
36) 730 x 929=
37) 856 x 201=
38) 745 x 527=
39) 984 x 182=
40) 826 x 876=
41) 711 x 798=
42) 889 x 889=
43) 496 x 284=
44) 415 x 258=
45) 393 x 217=
46) 273 x 490=
47) 242 x 655=
48) 575 x 637=
49) 932 x 249=
50) 254 x 582=




Answers

1) 312 * 691 = 215592 2) 345 * 606 = 209070 3) 158 * 472 = 74576 4) 234 * 924 = 216216 5) 262 * 184 = 48208 6) 660 * 261 = 172260 7) 644 * 613 = 394772 8) 663 * 216 = 143208 9) 167 * 254 = 42418 10) 537 * 126 = 67662 11) 865 * 362 = 313130 12) 518 * 429 = 222222 13) 906 * 745 = 674970 14) 275 * 340 = 93500 15) 642 * 133 = 85386 16) 366 * 281 = 102846 17) 984 * 375 = 369000 18) 592 * 916 = 542272 19) 378 * 470 = 177660 20) 244 * 472 = 115168 21) 704 * 644 = 453376 22) 103 * 304 = 31312 23) 838 * 196 = 164248 24) 871 * 724 = 630604 25) 357 * 730 = 260610 26) 975 * 659 = 642525 27) 956 * 245 = 234220 28) 907 * 980 = 888860 29) 919 * 340 = 312460 30) 617 * 758 = 467686 31) 235 * 323 = 75905 32) 319 * 679 = 216601 33) 828 * 978 = 809784 34) 319 * 411 = 131109 35) 583 * 120 = 69960 36) 730 * 929 = 678170 37) 856 * 201 = 172056 38) 745 * 527 = 392615 39) 984 * 182 = 179088 40) 826 * 876 = 723576 41) 711 * 798 = 567378 42) 889 * 889 = 790321 43) 496 * 284 = 140864 44) 415 * 258 = 107070 45) 393 * 217 = 85281 46) 273 * 490 = 133770 47) 242 * 655 = 158510 48) 575 * 637 = 366275 49) 932 * 249 = 232068 50) 254 * 582 = 147828

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 8

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 8