1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 80

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 80

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on November 19, 2020.

Questions

1) 278 x 613=
2) 727 x 537=
3) 672 x 866=
4) 134 x 754=
5) 451 x 576=
6) 241 x 847=
7) 724 x 369=
8) 879 x 285=
9) 656 x 680=
10) 522 x 168=
11) 762 x 204=
12) 535 x 524=
13) 688 x 627=
14) 309 x 356=
15) 337 x 837=
16) 631 x 736=
17) 713 x 717=
18) 736 x 584=
19) 556 x 256=
20) 149 x 746=
21) 315 x 794=
22) 319 x 642=
23) 678 x 335=
24) 882 x 636=
25) 425 x 257=
26) 363 x 194=
27) 789 x 170=
28) 296 x 292=
29) 442 x 749=
30) 522 x 357=
31) 816 x 670=
32) 346 x 342=
33) 777 x 975=
34) 352 x 853=
35) 446 x 174=
36) 458 x 693=
37) 242 x 580=
38) 161 x 755=
39) 572 x 408=
40) 846 x 694=
41) 261 x 454=
42) 967 x 728=
43) 110 x 277=
44) 186 x 933=
45) 575 x 226=
46) 489 x 574=
47) 874 x 830=
48) 656 x 826=
49) 789 x 280=
50) 409 x 836=




Answers

1) 278 * 613 = 170414 2) 727 * 537 = 390399 3) 672 * 866 = 581952 4) 134 * 754 = 101036 5) 451 * 576 = 259776 6) 241 * 847 = 204127 7) 724 * 369 = 267156 8) 879 * 285 = 250515 9) 656 * 680 = 446080 10) 522 * 168 = 87696 11) 762 * 204 = 155448 12) 535 * 524 = 280340 13) 688 * 627 = 431376 14) 309 * 356 = 110004 15) 337 * 837 = 282069 16) 631 * 736 = 464416 17) 713 * 717 = 511221 18) 736 * 584 = 429824 19) 556 * 256 = 142336 20) 149 * 746 = 111154 21) 315 * 794 = 250110 22) 319 * 642 = 204798 23) 678 * 335 = 227130 24) 882 * 636 = 560952 25) 425 * 257 = 109225 26) 363 * 194 = 70422 27) 789 * 170 = 134130 28) 296 * 292 = 86432 29) 442 * 749 = 331058 30) 522 * 357 = 186354 31) 816 * 670 = 546720 32) 346 * 342 = 118332 33) 777 * 975 = 757575 34) 352 * 853 = 300256 35) 446 * 174 = 77604 36) 458 * 693 = 317394 37) 242 * 580 = 140360 38) 161 * 755 = 121555 39) 572 * 408 = 233376 40) 846 * 694 = 587124 41) 261 * 454 = 118494 42) 967 * 728 = 703976 43) 110 * 277 = 30470 44) 186 * 933 = 173538 45) 575 * 226 = 129950 46) 489 * 574 = 280686 47) 874 * 830 = 725420 48) 656 * 826 = 541856 49) 789 * 280 = 220920 50) 409 * 836 = 341924

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 80

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 80