1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 81

Created on November 20, 2020.

Questions

1) 477 x 125=
2) 760 x 236=
3) 793 x 402=
4) 920 x 268=
5) 353 x 942=
6) 256 x 539=
7) 806 x 604=
8) 810 x 557=
9) 915 x 386=
10) 254 x 964=
11) 253 x 666=
12) 137 x 207=
13) 858 x 501=
14) 541 x 492=
15) 989 x 823=
16) 322 x 576=
17) 320 x 549=
18) 791 x 669=
19) 184 x 977=
20) 832 x 332=
21) 180 x 962=
22) 127 x 170=
23) 825 x 561=
24) 837 x 602=
25) 501 x 382=
26) 845 x 940=
27) 316 x 656=
28) 319 x 339=
29) 926 x 540=
30) 860 x 322=
31) 191 x 246=
32) 479 x 257=
33) 406 x 424=
34) 463 x 241=
35) 653 x 302=
36) 981 x 755=
37) 260 x 413=
38) 654 x 717=
39) 926 x 978=
40) 816 x 911=
41) 478 x 455=
42) 720 x 893=
43) 559 x 382=
44) 934 x 652=
45) 395 x 792=
46) 590 x 261=
47) 317 x 846=
48) 244 x 674=
49) 445 x 489=
50) 941 x 399=




Answers

1) 477 * 125 = 59625 2) 760 * 236 = 179360 3) 793 * 402 = 318786 4) 920 * 268 = 246560 5) 353 * 942 = 332526 6) 256 * 539 = 137984 7) 806 * 604 = 486824 8) 810 * 557 = 451170 9) 915 * 386 = 353190 10) 254 * 964 = 244856 11) 253 * 666 = 168498 12) 137 * 207 = 28359 13) 858 * 501 = 429858 14) 541 * 492 = 266172 15) 989 * 823 = 813947 16) 322 * 576 = 185472 17) 320 * 549 = 175680 18) 791 * 669 = 529179 19) 184 * 977 = 179768 20) 832 * 332 = 276224 21) 180 * 962 = 173160 22) 127 * 170 = 21590 23) 825 * 561 = 462825 24) 837 * 602 = 503874 25) 501 * 382 = 191382 26) 845 * 940 = 794300 27) 316 * 656 = 207296 28) 319 * 339 = 108141 29) 926 * 540 = 500040 30) 860 * 322 = 276920 31) 191 * 246 = 46986 32) 479 * 257 = 123103 33) 406 * 424 = 172144 34) 463 * 241 = 111583 35) 653 * 302 = 197206 36) 981 * 755 = 740655 37) 260 * 413 = 107380 38) 654 * 717 = 468918 39) 926 * 978 = 905628 40) 816 * 911 = 743376 41) 478 * 455 = 217490 42) 720 * 893 = 642960 43) 559 * 382 = 213538 44) 934 * 652 = 608968 45) 395 * 792 = 312840 46) 590 * 261 = 153990 47) 317 * 846 = 268182 48) 244 * 674 = 164456 49) 445 * 489 = 217605 50) 941 * 399 = 375459

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 81

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 81