JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 84

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 84

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on November 23, 2020.

Questions

1) 344 x 772=
2) 449 x 810=
3) 647 x 322=
4) 670 x 843=
5) 512 x 811=
6) 620 x 542=
7) 663 x 358=
8) 160 x 761=
9) 567 x 452=
10) 347 x 180=
11) 985 x 626=
12) 946 x 613=
13) 573 x 588=
14) 518 x 338=
15) 274 x 732=
16) 281 x 276=
17) 953 x 766=
18) 304 x 553=
19) 257 x 507=
20) 168 x 109=
21) 476 x 720=
22) 693 x 370=
23) 299 x 389=
24) 993 x 558=
25) 396 x 392=
26) 994 x 808=
27) 715 x 625=
28) 827 x 471=
29) 817 x 762=
30) 724 x 709=
31) 396 x 572=
32) 801 x 138=
33) 401 x 988=
34) 411 x 364=
35) 290 x 862=
36) 515 x 650=
37) 899 x 614=
38) 912 x 180=
39) 845 x 524=
40) 773 x 890=
41) 664 x 628=
42) 594 x 540=
43) 436 x 522=
44) 199 x 322=
45) 374 x 577=
46) 324 x 700=
47) 732 x 573=
48) 941 x 242=
49) 489 x 986=
50) 486 x 911=




Answers

1) 344 * 772 = 265568 2) 449 * 810 = 363690 3) 647 * 322 = 208334 4) 670 * 843 = 564810 5) 512 * 811 = 415232 6) 620 * 542 = 336040 7) 663 * 358 = 237354 8) 160 * 761 = 121760 9) 567 * 452 = 256284 10) 347 * 180 = 62460 11) 985 * 626 = 616610 12) 946 * 613 = 579898 13) 573 * 588 = 336924 14) 518 * 338 = 175084 15) 274 * 732 = 200568 16) 281 * 276 = 77556 17) 953 * 766 = 729998 18) 304 * 553 = 168112 19) 257 * 507 = 130299 20) 168 * 109 = 18312 21) 476 * 720 = 342720 22) 693 * 370 = 256410 23) 299 * 389 = 116311 24) 993 * 558 = 554094 25) 396 * 392 = 155232 26) 994 * 808 = 803152 27) 715 * 625 = 446875 28) 827 * 471 = 389517 29) 817 * 762 = 622554 30) 724 * 709 = 513316 31) 396 * 572 = 226512 32) 801 * 138 = 110538 33) 401 * 988 = 396188 34) 411 * 364 = 149604 35) 290 * 862 = 249980 36) 515 * 650 = 334750 37) 899 * 614 = 551986 38) 912 * 180 = 164160 39) 845 * 524 = 442780 40) 773 * 890 = 687970 41) 664 * 628 = 416992 42) 594 * 540 = 320760 43) 436 * 522 = 227592 44) 199 * 322 = 64078 45) 374 * 577 = 215798 46) 324 * 700 = 226800 47) 732 * 573 = 419436 48) 941 * 242 = 227722 49) 489 * 986 = 482154 50) 486 * 911 = 442746

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 84

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 84