JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 85

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 85

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on November 24, 2020.

Questions

1) 173 x 928=
2) 921 x 697=
3) 128 x 688=
4) 767 x 172=
5) 789 x 236=
6) 194 x 528=
7) 417 x 628=
8) 787 x 310=
9) 746 x 601=
10) 286 x 778=
11) 657 x 451=
12) 331 x 931=
13) 502 x 634=
14) 990 x 744=
15) 555 x 885=
16) 928 x 631=
17) 127 x 251=
18) 130 x 594=
19) 586 x 137=
20) 934 x 691=
21) 119 x 872=
22) 351 x 265=
23) 300 x 432=
24) 693 x 684=
25) 901 x 456=
26) 901 x 487=
27) 448 x 975=
28) 596 x 656=
29) 604 x 979=
30) 254 x 824=
31) 260 x 900=
32) 271 x 374=
33) 432 x 618=
34) 308 x 626=
35) 818 x 470=
36) 174 x 219=
37) 692 x 625=
38) 454 x 833=
39) 126 x 495=
40) 931 x 442=
41) 505 x 334=
42) 747 x 966=
43) 350 x 154=
44) 913 x 505=
45) 816 x 617=
46) 158 x 918=
47) 766 x 461=
48) 582 x 436=
49) 696 x 115=
50) 175 x 749=




Answers

1) 173 * 928 = 160544 2) 921 * 697 = 641937 3) 128 * 688 = 88064 4) 767 * 172 = 131924 5) 789 * 236 = 186204 6) 194 * 528 = 102432 7) 417 * 628 = 261876 8) 787 * 310 = 243970 9) 746 * 601 = 448346 10) 286 * 778 = 222508 11) 657 * 451 = 296307 12) 331 * 931 = 308161 13) 502 * 634 = 318268 14) 990 * 744 = 736560 15) 555 * 885 = 491175 16) 928 * 631 = 585568 17) 127 * 251 = 31877 18) 130 * 594 = 77220 19) 586 * 137 = 80282 20) 934 * 691 = 645394 21) 119 * 872 = 103768 22) 351 * 265 = 93015 23) 300 * 432 = 129600 24) 693 * 684 = 474012 25) 901 * 456 = 410856 26) 901 * 487 = 438787 27) 448 * 975 = 436800 28) 596 * 656 = 390976 29) 604 * 979 = 591316 30) 254 * 824 = 209296 31) 260 * 900 = 234000 32) 271 * 374 = 101354 33) 432 * 618 = 266976 34) 308 * 626 = 192808 35) 818 * 470 = 384460 36) 174 * 219 = 38106 37) 692 * 625 = 432500 38) 454 * 833 = 378182 39) 126 * 495 = 62370 40) 931 * 442 = 411502 41) 505 * 334 = 168670 42) 747 * 966 = 721602 43) 350 * 154 = 53900 44) 913 * 505 = 461065 45) 816 * 617 = 503472 46) 158 * 918 = 145044 47) 766 * 461 = 353126 48) 582 * 436 = 253752 49) 696 * 115 = 80040 50) 175 * 749 = 131075

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 85

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 85