JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 88

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 88

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on November 27, 2020.

Questions

1) 307 x 977=
2) 377 x 832=
3) 145 x 264=
4) 334 x 538=
5) 580 x 822=
6) 557 x 816=
7) 507 x 752=
8) 390 x 427=
9) 232 x 605=
10) 447 x 430=
11) 758 x 663=
12) 614 x 555=
13) 109 x 244=
14) 221 x 215=
15) 812 x 817=
16) 223 x 538=
17) 706 x 469=
18) 100 x 788=
19) 787 x 412=
20) 938 x 357=
21) 546 x 938=
22) 294 x 532=
23) 140 x 167=
24) 900 x 889=
25) 856 x 221=
26) 219 x 125=
27) 760 x 630=
28) 644 x 528=
29) 481 x 148=
30) 974 x 198=
31) 330 x 222=
32) 232 x 803=
33) 827 x 815=
34) 175 x 764=
35) 559 x 763=
36) 106 x 705=
37) 886 x 169=
38) 535 x 393=
39) 885 x 392=
40) 482 x 280=
41) 313 x 988=
42) 728 x 514=
43) 129 x 804=
44) 578 x 871=
45) 628 x 267=
46) 934 x 825=
47) 169 x 754=
48) 531 x 456=
49) 689 x 681=
50) 242 x 328=




Answers

1) 307 * 977 = 299939 2) 377 * 832 = 313664 3) 145 * 264 = 38280 4) 334 * 538 = 179692 5) 580 * 822 = 476760 6) 557 * 816 = 454512 7) 507 * 752 = 381264 8) 390 * 427 = 166530 9) 232 * 605 = 140360 10) 447 * 430 = 192210 11) 758 * 663 = 502554 12) 614 * 555 = 340770 13) 109 * 244 = 26596 14) 221 * 215 = 47515 15) 812 * 817 = 663404 16) 223 * 538 = 119974 17) 706 * 469 = 331114 18) 100 * 788 = 78800 19) 787 * 412 = 324244 20) 938 * 357 = 334866 21) 546 * 938 = 512148 22) 294 * 532 = 156408 23) 140 * 167 = 23380 24) 900 * 889 = 800100 25) 856 * 221 = 189176 26) 219 * 125 = 27375 27) 760 * 630 = 478800 28) 644 * 528 = 340032 29) 481 * 148 = 71188 30) 974 * 198 = 192852 31) 330 * 222 = 73260 32) 232 * 803 = 186296 33) 827 * 815 = 674005 34) 175 * 764 = 133700 35) 559 * 763 = 426517 36) 106 * 705 = 74730 37) 886 * 169 = 149734 38) 535 * 393 = 210255 39) 885 * 392 = 346920 40) 482 * 280 = 134960 41) 313 * 988 = 309244 42) 728 * 514 = 374192 43) 129 * 804 = 103716 44) 578 * 871 = 503438 45) 628 * 267 = 167676 46) 934 * 825 = 770550 47) 169 * 754 = 127426 48) 531 * 456 = 242136 49) 689 * 681 = 469209 50) 242 * 328 = 79376

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 88

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 88