JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 89

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 89

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on November 28, 2020.

Questions

1) 836 x 998=
2) 996 x 127=
3) 330 x 887=
4) 393 x 267=
5) 181 x 835=
6) 904 x 741=
7) 568 x 978=
8) 732 x 585=
9) 451 x 698=
10) 277 x 167=
11) 251 x 857=
12) 812 x 716=
13) 561 x 963=
14) 117 x 543=
15) 750 x 722=
16) 623 x 561=
17) 293 x 545=
18) 771 x 622=
19) 874 x 893=
20) 474 x 608=
21) 239 x 832=
22) 396 x 558=
23) 611 x 606=
24) 416 x 632=
25) 555 x 375=
26) 448 x 204=
27) 273 x 648=
28) 697 x 587=
29) 832 x 975=
30) 898 x 494=
31) 828 x 281=
32) 357 x 251=
33) 132 x 608=
34) 947 x 615=
35) 580 x 917=
36) 402 x 137=
37) 680 x 724=
38) 708 x 120=
39) 656 x 389=
40) 820 x 366=
41) 430 x 873=
42) 370 x 356=
43) 634 x 947=
44) 127 x 931=
45) 842 x 238=
46) 414 x 989=
47) 503 x 112=
48) 904 x 490=
49) 369 x 246=
50) 475 x 783=




Answers

1) 836 * 998 = 834328 2) 996 * 127 = 126492 3) 330 * 887 = 292710 4) 393 * 267 = 104931 5) 181 * 835 = 151135 6) 904 * 741 = 669864 7) 568 * 978 = 555504 8) 732 * 585 = 428220 9) 451 * 698 = 314798 10) 277 * 167 = 46259 11) 251 * 857 = 215107 12) 812 * 716 = 581392 13) 561 * 963 = 540243 14) 117 * 543 = 63531 15) 750 * 722 = 541500 16) 623 * 561 = 349503 17) 293 * 545 = 159685 18) 771 * 622 = 479562 19) 874 * 893 = 780482 20) 474 * 608 = 288192 21) 239 * 832 = 198848 22) 396 * 558 = 220968 23) 611 * 606 = 370266 24) 416 * 632 = 262912 25) 555 * 375 = 208125 26) 448 * 204 = 91392 27) 273 * 648 = 176904 28) 697 * 587 = 409139 29) 832 * 975 = 811200 30) 898 * 494 = 443612 31) 828 * 281 = 232668 32) 357 * 251 = 89607 33) 132 * 608 = 80256 34) 947 * 615 = 582405 35) 580 * 917 = 531860 36) 402 * 137 = 55074 37) 680 * 724 = 492320 38) 708 * 120 = 84960 39) 656 * 389 = 255184 40) 820 * 366 = 300120 41) 430 * 873 = 375390 42) 370 * 356 = 131720 43) 634 * 947 = 600398 44) 127 * 931 = 118237 45) 842 * 238 = 200396 46) 414 * 989 = 409446 47) 503 * 112 = 56336 48) 904 * 490 = 442960 49) 369 * 246 = 90774 50) 475 * 783 = 371925

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 89

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 89