1st Grade 2nd Grade 3rd Grade 4th Grade 5th Grade 6th Grade 7th Grade 8th Grade Mental Math Times Table

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 9

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 9

Last updated on November 29, 2020. Created on September 9, 2020.

Questions

1) 458 x 489=
2) 110 x 580=
3) 586 x 168=
4) 391 x 496=
5) 888 x 458=
6) 323 x 195=
7) 290 x 770=
8) 591 x 376=
9) 483 x 590=
10) 960 x 180=
11) 343 x 587=
12) 170 x 275=
13) 807 x 587=
14) 754 x 453=
15) 694 x 249=
16) 586 x 422=
17) 781 x 336=
18) 546 x 853=
19) 792 x 238=
20) 547 x 402=
21) 634 x 573=
22) 475 x 494=
23) 335 x 972=
24) 144 x 798=
25) 985 x 376=
26) 198 x 999=
27) 670 x 731=
28) 990 x 860=
29) 153 x 415=
30) 217 x 502=
31) 740 x 299=
32) 521 x 637=
33) 575 x 369=
34) 808 x 954=
35) 746 x 119=
36) 257 x 966=
37) 473 x 984=
38) 318 x 607=
39) 782 x 525=
40) 230 x 140=
41) 719 x 355=
42) 106 x 404=
43) 745 x 742=
44) 138 x 444=
45) 417 x 877=
46) 448 x 453=
47) 281 x 363=
48) 131 x 889=
49) 806 x 250=
50) 649 x 926=




Answers

1) 458 * 489 = 223962 2) 110 * 580 = 63800 3) 586 * 168 = 98448 4) 391 * 496 = 193936 5) 888 * 458 = 406704 6) 323 * 195 = 62985 7) 290 * 770 = 223300 8) 591 * 376 = 222216 9) 483 * 590 = 284970 10) 960 * 180 = 172800 11) 343 * 587 = 201341 12) 170 * 275 = 46750 13) 807 * 587 = 473709 14) 754 * 453 = 341562 15) 694 * 249 = 172806 16) 586 * 422 = 247292 17) 781 * 336 = 262416 18) 546 * 853 = 465738 19) 792 * 238 = 188496 20) 547 * 402 = 219894 21) 634 * 573 = 363282 22) 475 * 494 = 234650 23) 335 * 972 = 325620 24) 144 * 798 = 114912 25) 985 * 376 = 370360 26) 198 * 999 = 197802 27) 670 * 731 = 489770 28) 990 * 860 = 851400 29) 153 * 415 = 63495 30) 217 * 502 = 108934 31) 740 * 299 = 221260 32) 521 * 637 = 331877 33) 575 * 369 = 212175 34) 808 * 954 = 770832 35) 746 * 119 = 88774 36) 257 * 966 = 248262 37) 473 * 984 = 465432 38) 318 * 607 = 193026 39) 782 * 525 = 410550 40) 230 * 140 = 32200 41) 719 * 355 = 255245 42) 106 * 404 = 42824 43) 745 * 742 = 552790 44) 138 * 444 = 61272 45) 417 * 877 = 365709 46) 448 * 453 = 202944 47) 281 * 363 = 102003 48) 131 * 889 = 116459 49) 806 * 250 = 201500 50) 649 * 926 = 600974

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 9

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 9