JustMath.org

multiplication 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Multiply 3 digit by 3 digit Worksheet 91

Last updated on December 21, 2020. Created on November 30, 2020.

Questions

1) 630 x 590=
2) 491 x 461=
3) 233 x 437=
4) 204 x 147=
5) 494 x 568=
6) 745 x 655=
7) 321 x 539=
8) 540 x 585=
9) 582 x 857=
10) 963 x 171=
11) 672 x 276=
12) 476 x 422=
13) 890 x 616=
14) 448 x 603=
15) 952 x 849=
16) 522 x 726=
17) 203 x 222=
18) 241 x 642=
19) 425 x 770=
20) 751 x 889=
21) 400 x 645=
22) 867 x 402=
23) 793 x 826=
24) 876 x 126=
25) 704 x 838=
26) 434 x 301=
27) 138 x 836=
28) 869 x 557=
29) 987 x 763=
30) 180 x 155=
31) 409 x 360=
32) 782 x 159=
33) 370 x 284=
34) 862 x 853=
35) 736 x 726=
36) 800 x 325=
37) 864 x 279=
38) 621 x 931=
39) 752 x 927=
40) 774 x 928=
41) 991 x 219=
42) 340 x 402=
43) 474 x 950=
44) 956 x 120=
45) 566 x 281=
46) 151 x 268=
47) 756 x 826=
48) 555 x 729=
49) 551 x 544=
50) 125 x 261=




Answers

1) 630 * 590 = 371700 2) 491 * 461 = 226351 3) 233 * 437 = 101821 4) 204 * 147 = 29988 5) 494 * 568 = 280592 6) 745 * 655 = 487975 7) 321 * 539 = 173019 8) 540 * 585 = 315900 9) 582 * 857 = 498774 10) 963 * 171 = 164673 11) 672 * 276 = 185472 12) 476 * 422 = 200872 13) 890 * 616 = 548240 14) 448 * 603 = 270144 15) 952 * 849 = 808248 16) 522 * 726 = 378972 17) 203 * 222 = 45066 18) 241 * 642 = 154722 19) 425 * 770 = 327250 20) 751 * 889 = 667639 21) 400 * 645 = 258000 22) 867 * 402 = 348534 23) 793 * 826 = 655018 24) 876 * 126 = 110376 25) 704 * 838 = 589952 26) 434 * 301 = 130634 27) 138 * 836 = 115368 28) 869 * 557 = 484033 29) 987 * 763 = 753081 30) 180 * 155 = 27900 31) 409 * 360 = 147240 32) 782 * 159 = 124338 33) 370 * 284 = 105080 34) 862 * 853 = 735286 35) 736 * 726 = 534336 36) 800 * 325 = 260000 37) 864 * 279 = 241056 38) 621 * 931 = 578151 39) 752 * 927 = 697104 40) 774 * 928 = 718272 41) 991 * 219 = 217029 42) 340 * 402 = 136680 43) 474 * 950 = 450300 44) 956 * 120 = 114720 45) 566 * 281 = 159046 46) 151 * 268 = 40468 47) 756 * 826 = 624456 48) 555 * 729 = 404595 49) 551 * 544 = 299744 50) 125 * 261 = 32625

Next

multiplication 4 digit by 1 digit Worksheet 91

Previous

Long Division with reminder Worksheet 91